Kevin M. Haynes v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Paul L Abrams |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02299 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
order
Awarding EAJA Fees
Fri 01/12 10:36 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Fees awarded to plaintiff in the amount of $ 3950.00. Re: Stipulation for Award of EAJA Fees20 (ch) |
|
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
stip
Award of EAJA Fees
Thu 01/11 11:41 AM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $3950. filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes.(Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 12/01 11:40 AM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion filed concurrently herewith, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the defendant, the Commissioner of Social Security Administration, is reversed and this case is remanded to defendant for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum Opinion.18 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (ch) |
|
18 | 18
17
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 12/01 11:29 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) plaintiff's request for remand is GRANTED; (2) the decision of the Commissioner is REVERSED; and (3) this action is REMANDED to defendant for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum Opinion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court serve copies of this Order and the Judgment herein on all parties or their counsel. This Memorandum Opinion and Order is not intended for publication, nor is it intended to be included in or submitted to any online service such as Westlaw or Lexis. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Mon 11/13 4:40 PM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wolking, Tova) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Mon 08/21 9:12 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wolking, Tova) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/21 9:05 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Wolking, Tova) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/10 10:16 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Wolking, Tova) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/21 3:33 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV17-2299 PLA on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Thu 04/20 9:27 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Tova D Wolking added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Wolking, Tova) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Tue 04/11 3:36 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Social Security Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (120 days)
Tue 04/11 3:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/10/2017, answer due 8/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to O. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to A. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to civil process clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Mon 03/27 9:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal. (ch) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 8:30 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (sbu) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/27 8:29 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: granting3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbu) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 1:39 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (et) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 11:12 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes, (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 11:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/23 11:10 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 11:09 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes. (Rohlfing, Lawrence) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 11:08 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kevin M Haynes. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party Kevin M Haynes(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence) |