Eric J. Mauritzen v. Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00555 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric J. Mauritzen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer)
Wed 04/19 5:20 AM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from California Northern District, 3:17-cv-02105 filed 4/14/2017. (lom) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring MDL Case per JPML Order
Fri 04/14 10:41 AM
Conditional Transfer Order - 93 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (dro) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/28 10:53 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge David O. Carter: STAYING CASE All proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending a determination by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (the "MDL Panel") concerning the transfer of this action. (mba) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Transferring Case purs GO 16-05 (Related Case)(CV 34)
Mon 03/27 4:25 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:15-cv-01930 DOC(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow and Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-00555 DOC(SPx). Signed by Judge David O. Carter (rn) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 10:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 10:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-00555 MWF (DTBx). (car) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 11:03 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,, identifying Volkswagen AG. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Thu 03/23 11:02 AM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendants VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. Related Case(s): 02:15-cv-07367; 2:15-cv-07375; 2:15-cv-07390; 2:15-cv-07391; 2:15-cv-07395; 2:15-cv-07429; 2:15-cv-07430; 2:15-cv-07431; 2:15-cv-07432; 2:15-cv-07473; 2:15-cv-07474; 2:15-cv-07475; 2:15-cv-07477; 2:15-cv-07517; 2:15-cv-01930; 2:15-cv-01948; 2:15-cv-01525; 8:16-cv-00209; 2:16-cv-01143; 2:16-cv-1120; 2:16-cv-01119; 2:16-cv-01104; 2:16-cv-01205; 2:16-cv-01164; 2:16-cv-01507; 2:16-cv-01527; 2:16-cv-01539; 2:16-cv-01563; 2:16-cv-01573; 2:16-cv-01575; 2:16-cv-01576; 2:16-cv-01577; 2:16-cv-01578; 2:16-cv-01580; 2:16-cv-1661; 2:16-cv-1662; 2:16-cv-1663; 5:16-cv-00462; 2:16-cv-01970; 2:16-cv-02014; 2:16-cv-02046; 2:16-cv-02148; 2:16-cv-02210; 2:16-cv-02214; 2:16-cv-02301; 2:16-cv-02302; 2:16-cv-02420; 2:16-cv-02429; 2:16-cv-02438; 2:16-cv-02469; 2:16-cv-2637; 2:16-cv-2796; 2:16-cv-805; 2:16-cv-02892; 2:16-cv-03074; 2:16-cv-03161; 5:16-cv-933; 2:16-cv-03162; 2:16-cv-3163; 5:16-cv-934; 8:16-cv-894; 2:16-cv-3385; 2:16-cv-3537; 2:16-cv-3727; 5:16-cv-1100; 2:16-cv-03776; 2:16-cv-3985; 2:16-cv-04171; 5:16-cv-01238; 2:16-cv-04177; 2:16-cv-04178; 2:16-cv-04179; 2:16-cv-04180; 2:16-cv-04181; 2:16-cv-4242; 2:16-cv-4244; 2:16-cv-4246; 8:16-cv-01111; 2:16-cv-4331; 2:16-cv-04333; 2:16-cv-04336; 2:16-cv-04338; 2:16-cv-4382; 8:16-cv-1139; 2:16-cv-4386; 2:16-cv-4392; 2:16-cv-4393; 2:16-cv-4394; 2:16-cv-4395; 2:16-cv-4399; 2:16-cv-4400; 2:16-cv-4401; 2:16-cv-4402; 2:16-cv-4403; 2:16-cv-4404;2:16-cv-4405;2:16-cv-04406; 2:16-cv-4423; 2:16-cv-4514; 2:16-cv-4630; 5:16-cv-1406; 2:16-cv-4774; 5:16-cv-01468; 8:16-cv-01252; 2:16-cv-04963; 8:16-cv-01256; 5:16-cv-01475; 5:16-cv-01476; 5:16-cv-01480; 2:16-cv-04989; 8:16-cv-01259; 2:16-cv-04997; 5:16-cv-01485; 2:16-cv-05068; 8:16-cv-01292; 8:16-CV-01314; 2:16-cv-5355; 2:16-cv-05631; 5:16-cv-01649; 5:16-cv-01650; 2:16-cv-05669; 2:16-cv-05776; 2:16-cv-05868; 2:16-cv-05874; 5:16-cv-01706; 5:16-cv-01707; 5:16-cv-01708; 2:16-cv-05875; 2:16-cv-05876; 8:16-cv-01456; 5:16-cv-01709; 2:16-cv-05877; 8:16-cv-01457; 8:16-cv-01458; 2:16-cv-05879; 8:16-cv-01459; 2:16-cv-05880; 2:16-cv-05881; 2:16-cv-05882; 2:16-cv-058832:16-cv-05938; 2:16-cv-06023; 8:16-cv-01491; 5:16-cv-01732; 2:16-cv-6564; 5:16-cv-01865; 5:16-cv-01917; 2:16-cv-6831; 2:16-cv-6832; 2:16-cv-6838; 2:16-cv-6839; 2:16-cv-6899; 2:16-cv-6900; 2:16-cv-6909; 2:16-cv-6917; 2:16-cv-06947; 2:16-cv-07065; 5:16-cv-02013; 5:16-cv-02014; 5:16-cv-02017; 5:16-cv-02018; 2:16-cv-07152; 2:16-cv-07255; 2:16-cv-07270; 8:16-cv-01916; 2:16-cv-7799; 2:16-cv-7945; 2:16-cv-7951; 2:16-cv-7957; 2:16-cv-07972; 2:16-cv-7985; 2:16-cv-7990; 2:16-cv-8065; 2:16-cv-8173; 5:16-cv-02392; 2:16-cv-08635; 2:16-cv-08648; 2:16-cv-08988; 2:16-cv-9137; 2:16-cv-9154; 2:16-cv-9235; 5:16-CV-02566; 2:16-cv-9327; 2:16-cv-05355; 2:16-cv-09431; 2:16-cv-09444; 2:16-cv-09446; 2:17-cv-581; 5:17-cv-142; 5:17-CV-00144; 2:17-cv-00652; 2:17-cv-00701; 5:17-cv-00158; 2:17-cv-00704; 2:17-cv-00705; 2:17-cv-00769; 2:17-cv-00775; 2:17-cv-00905; 2:17-cv-00908; 2:17-cv-00928; 8:17-cv-00200; 5:17-cv-00213; 2:17-cv-01071; 5:17-cv-00250; 2:17-cv-01115; 2:17-cv-01119; 2:17-cv-01120; 2:17-cv-01180; 8:17-cv-00274; 2:17-cv-01315; 2:17-cv-01355; 2:17-cv-01356; 2:17-CV-01357; 2:17-cv-01358; 2:17-CV-01359; 5:17-CV-00313; 2:17-cv-01360; 2:17-cv-01447; 2:17-cv-01455; 5:17-cv-00360; 5:17-cv-00361; 8:17-cv-00331; 2:17-cv-01556; 8:17-cv-00365; 5:17-cv-00377; 8:17-cv-00366; 2:17-cv-01622; 8:17-cv-00374; 2:17-cv-01675; 2:17-CV-01676; 2:17-CV-01677; 2:17-cv-01767; 3:17-cv-1118; 2:17-cv-01832; 5:17-cv-430; 2:17-cv-1850; 2:17-cv-001948; 3:17-cv-01283; 5:17-cv-00451; 5:17-cv-00486; 2:17-cv-02080; 9:17-cv-00494; 2:17-cv-02110 (Oswell, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 10:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Oswell, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 10:57 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside County Superior Court, case number MCC1700159 Receipt No: 0973-19563284 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,. (Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Kabler Oswell added to party VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC., (pty:dft))(Oswell, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal | ||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/24 10:22 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Eric J. Mauritzen, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Becky DeGeorge, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Served on 2/21/2017 Answer due 3/15/2017. Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 03/24 10:26 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Eric J. Mauritzen, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC Becky DeGeorge, Person Authorized to Accept Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Served on 2/21/2017 Answer due 3/15/2017. Original Summons NOT returned. Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/24 10:29 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eric J. Mauritzen. Filed in State Court on 2/16/17. Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B (car) Modified on 3/24/2017 (car) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 03/24 10:32 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 10, inclusive, VKS Murrieta Limited Partnership, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed in State Court on 3/21/17 by Plaintiff Eric J. Mauritzen Submitted with Attachment 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal(car) |