Frank Rust v. Chino Prison Healthcare Providers et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00556 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 29, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chino Prison Healthcare Providers
|
|
Defendant
Dr A Farooq Muhammed
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dr Michael Vu
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank A Rust
CDC T-08468 California Institution for Men P O Box 368
Chino, CA 91708 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
L. Escobell
Terminated: 08/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T. Moll
Terminated: 08/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
S. Ocegura
Terminated: 08/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Warfield
Terminated: 08/02/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
119 | 119
misc
Financial Entry IFP Filing Fee
Thu 04/18 2:16 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $15.95 subsequent payment from plaintiff Frank A Rust on 04/18/2024, receipt number RS649, re: USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order,98 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (ap) |