Marcelous Murphy v. Target Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Alicia G Rosenberg |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00559 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcelous Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 08/15 3:45 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rul41(a)(I)(A)(ii) FRCP filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/07 9:16 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Last Day to Stipulate or File a Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add New Parties: JULY 10, 2017; Deadline for Initial Designation of Expert Witnesses: OCTOBER 2, 2017; Deadline for Designation of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses: OCTOBER 9, 2017; Discovery Cut-Off: OCTOBER 31, 2017; Summary Judgment Motion Hearing Cut Off: DECEMBER 4, 2017; Last day to Conduct Mediation: AUGUST 30, 2017; Pretrial Conference: JANUARY 8, 2018 AT 2:30 P.M.; Jury Trial: JANUARY 23, 2018 AT 8:30 A.M., Trial Estimate: 3 Days (bm) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 06/07 9:13 AM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge Virginia A. Phillips: Court and counsel confer re case and settlement status. The settlement conference shall be conducted no later than August 30, 2017. The parties shall file a joint report no later than 10 days after the settlement conference regarding the progress of mediation. The parties elect to proceed with Settlement Procedure No. 3, private mediator. Counsel shall agree on mediator and obtain date sufficiently in advance of cutoff date set above. The trial schedule, motion and discovery cutoff dates will be set forth in a separate Civil Trial Scheduling Order to be filed and served on counsel by the clerk. Court will issue Order to Show Cause re: Jurisdiction. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 05/23 2:09 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant Target Corporation.. (Latortue, Cherise) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 04/12 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Target Corporation, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only9 served on April 12, 2017.(Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service of Standing Order | ||
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/31 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF All Plaintiffs, identifying MARCELOUS MURPHY. (Taylor, Christopher) |
|
11 | 11
trial
Jury Demand
Fri 03/31 12:43 PM
DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by PLAINTIFF Marcelous Murphy.. (Taylor, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 03/29 12:24 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 6/5/2017 at 01:30 PM before Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/28 6:30 PM
STANDING ORDER ISSUED by Chief Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (bh) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/27 12:49 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Target Corporation, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form6 , Notice of Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form,5 served on March 24, 2017. (Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 03/27 12:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Target Corporation, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 served on March 24, 2017.(Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service of Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:14 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Thu 03/23 5:14 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-00559-VAP (AGRx). (et) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 03/23 3:26 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT By Defendant Target Corporation filed by Movant Target Corporation (Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 3:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Target Corporation, (Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 3:18 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Target Corporation. (Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 3:14 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1622345 Receipt No: 0973-19565821 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Target Corporation. (Attorney Mandana Massoumi added to party Target Corporation(pty:mov))(Massoumi, Mandana) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mandana Massoumi In Support of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Mandana Massoumi, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Mandana Massoumi, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Mandana Massoumi, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Mandana Massoumi | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 5:09 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Target Corporation., Does 1 through 25, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Marcelous Murphy. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/29/2016 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT A TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/23 5:11 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Target Corporation. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/27/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT B TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #3](et) |