Maria C. Espudo v. FCA US LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00560 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maria C. Espudo
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Triangle Motors, Inc
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
59 | 59
order
Dismissing Case
Mon 12/09 2:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS CASE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. re Stipulation to Dismiss Case58 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (vm) |
|
58 | 58
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 12/09 9:37 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Maria C. Espudo.(Colon, Maite) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |