Carl J. Cieslikowski et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00562 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 23, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Carl J. Cieslikowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cathy L. Cieslikowski
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
J. Velarde, Inc.
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, March 24, 2022 | ||
244 | 244
appeal
USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order
Fri 03/25 11:41 AM
ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,238 filed by Cathy L. Cieslikowski, Carl J. Cieslikowski. CCA # 21-55874 The parties' stipulated motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. This appeal is dismissed. Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). Costs and fees shall be allocated pursuant to the parties' stipulation. This order served on the district court acts as the mandate of this court. (hr) |