James Zarian v. Joseph Sitkin et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00524 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Kit Kraft, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gussie P. Sitkin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Joseph Sitkin
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
James Zarian
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Tue 05/16 5:29 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to with prejudice filed by Planitiff James Zarian.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/27 11:06 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Staying Action Pending Final Settlement and Removing Case From Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On April 27, 2017, counsel for plaintiff filed a "Notice of Settlement"12 . The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by June 30, 2017. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Thu 04/27 3:36 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Planitiff James Zarian.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 04/17 2:01 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kit Kraft, Inc. answer now due 5/19/2017; Gussie P. Sitkin(in individual ) answer now due 5/19/2017; Joseph Sitki answer now due 5/19/2017; Joseph Sitkin(in individual) answer now due 5/19/2017; Gussie P. Sitki answer now due 5/19/2017, filed by Defendants Kit Kraft, Inc.; Gussie P. Sitkin(in individual ); Joseph Sitki; Joseph Sitkin(in individual); Gussie P. Sitki.(Attorney David E Karlin added to party Kit Kraft, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David E Karlin added to party Gussie P. Sitkin(pty:dft), Attorney David E Karlin added to party Gussie P. Sitkin(pty:dft), Attorney David E Karlin added to party Joseph Sitkin(pty:dft), Attorney David E Karlin added to party Joseph Sitkin(pty:dft))(Karlin, David) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/13 12:27 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Zarian, upon Defendant Joseph Sitki served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017; Joseph Sitkin(in individual) served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joseph Sitkin, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/13 12:24 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Zarian, upon Defendant Gussie P. Sitkin(in individual ) served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017; Gussie P. Sitki served on 4/5/2017, answer due 4/26/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gussie P. Sitkin, in individual and representative capacity as trustee in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/30 3:24 PM
MINUTE IN CHAMBERS ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff, individually or through counsel, to attend a hearing prepared to review how the Court and the parties can meet this requirement in this case. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiff to be sure that all parties who have been served or have appeared receive this order. The Court ORDERS that this hearing take place on May 1, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. See document for further information. (dv) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/27 9:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kit Kraft, Inc., Gussie P. Sitkin(in individual ), Gussie P. Sitki , Joseph Sitki, Joseph Sitkin(in individual). (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 9:44 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/23 4:41 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff James Zarian. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/23 4:39 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff James Zarian, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 4:37 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Zarian. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 4:35 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19561518 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff James Zarian. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party James Zarian(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |