United States of America v. 127,500.00 In U.S. Currency
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | James V Selna |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00526 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
127,500.00 In U.S. Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Fri 10/27 1:58 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Default Judgment,21 , returned executed upon 127,500.00 In U.S. Currency on 10/11/17. Remarks: Forfeited $127,500.00 (16-FBI-004752) On 9/29/2017. (es) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment - Default by Judge
Tue 09/26 1:25 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE by Judge James V. Selna, ACCORDINGLY, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all rights, title, and interest of known potential claimant Galaviz and all unknown potential claimants in and to the defendant currency are condemned and forfeited to the United States of America.17 . ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (es) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Default Judgment
Wed 09/13 2:26 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge James V. Selna: granting Plaintiff's17 MOTION for Default Judgment. For the aforementioned reasons, the Court grants United States the right of title and ownership of Defendant $127,500.00 in U.S. currency. The Court finds that oral argument would not be helpful in this matter and therefore vacates the September 18, 2017 hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. (twdb) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 09/11 11:33 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment AGAINST THE INTERESTS OF KNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANT JESUS ULISES TELLO GALAVIZ, AND ALL UNKNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANTS17 (A) WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT BASED ON NON-RECEIPT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; AND (B) REQUEST TO VACATE HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff United States of America.(Almadani, Yasin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/11 8:29 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) The plaintiff filed its motion for default judgment17 on 8/10/2017. In light of this filing, the Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for 8/14/2017 at 11:30 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Default Judgment
Thu 08/10 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment AGAINST THE INTERESTS OF KNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANT JESUS ULISES TELLO GALAVIZ, AND ALL UNKNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANTS filed by plaintiff United States of America. Motion set for hearing on 9/18/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Almadani, Yasin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Yasin M. Almadani, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Default Judgment, | ||
Att: 7 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 07/05 4:24 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) The Court, noting that default was entered15 on 6/29/2017, continues the Scheduling Conference, previously scheduled for 7/10/2017 at 11:30 AM, to MONDAY, 8/14/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. If plaintiff has filed its application/motion for default judgment by the 8/10/2017 the Court will vacate the scheduling conference. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kt) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Thu 06/29 12:10 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to 127,500 In U.S. Currency (es) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Wed 06/28 8:35 AM
APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against THE INTERESTS OF KNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANT JESUS ULISES TELLO GALAVIZ, AND ALL UNKNOWN POTENTIAL CLAIMANTS 127,500.00 In U.S. Currency filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Almadani, Yasin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Yasin M. Almadani, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit "A", | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit "B", | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit "C", | ||
Att: 5 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint by Publication
Tue 05/02 2:20 PM
SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 03/27/2017 and 03/28/2017 upon Defendant All Defendants. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
USM-285 Service of non-complaint documents - Executed
Wed 04/26 11:53 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of Complaint/Warrant1 , returned executed upon 127,500.00 In U.S. Currency on 4/6/2017. Remarks: SEIZED $127,500.00 (16-FBI-004752) AS SACV 17-0526 ON 4/6/2017. (mt) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 04/13 3:42 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge James V. Selna. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/3/2017. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge James V. Selna. (jlen) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 04/13 11:42 AM
INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (jlen) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Warrant for Seizure Issued
Fri 03/24 12:17 PM
WARRANT for seizure of 127,500.00 In U.S. Currency issued on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (car) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 12:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 7:54 AM
NOTICE OF RECUSAL OF INVOLVEMENT OF FIRST ASSISTANT UNITED STATES ATTORNEY PATRICK R. FITZGERALD IN THIS CASE filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Thu 03/23 7:52 AM
MEMORANDUM OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Memorandum by U S Attorney re Judge Assignment
Thu 03/23 7:48 AM
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on 03/23/2017, was not pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judges Andre Birotte, Jr. and Michael W. Fitzgerald began receiving civil matters. (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Warrant for Seizure Request
Thu 03/23 7:46 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Warrant for Seizure on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/23 7:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Mohammad, Yasin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/23 7:42 AM
COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,. (Attorney Yasin Mohammad added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA,(pty:pla))(Mohammad, Yasin) |