Hamm et al v. FCA US LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Bernard G Skomal |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00577 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332bw Diversity -Breach of Warranty |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Hamm
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Susan Taty Hamm
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Bob Baker Automotive, Inc.
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 19 2019
ORDER granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 8/16/2019. (jrm) (jao). |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
109 | 109
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 09/20 10:49 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 9/19/2019.(jrm) |
|
108 | 108
order
Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
Fri 09/20 10:43 AM
Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Accepting re107 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, from Plaintiffs Alan Hamm, Susan Taty Hamm. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF § 2(h) - Includes a proposed order or requires judges signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(jrm) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
107 | 107
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/19 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alan Hamm, Susan Taty Hamm Joint Stipulation and Order for Dismissal with Prejudice(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |