In the Matter of Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred by the State Bar of California
California Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 3:17-mc-00413 |
Cause | 00:0000 Cause Code Unknown |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/14 10:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Geoffrey C. Morrison. (mxn) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/14 5:25 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Amy L. Spencer. (mxn) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 06/14 5:19 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Steven Gregory Kaplan. (mxn) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 06/09 4:37 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re22 Order,. Mail sent to John P. Christenson. (sjt) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 06/01 12:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re22 Order. (mxn) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order
Wed 05/24 8:59 AM
ORDER re1 Order to Show Cause. None of the listed attorneys have responded. Therefore, the Court orders that the attorneys listed above as being disbarred by the State Bar of California are disbarred from membership in the bar of this Court. The Court also orders that the attorneys listed above as being suspended or placed on the inactive list by the State Bar of California are suspended from membership in the bar of this court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/22/2017.(mpl) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Wed 05/24 8:55 AM
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause (Attorney David Andrew Seeley). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/22/2017.(mpl) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order
Wed 05/24 8:53 AM
ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause (Attorney Steven Michael Gribben). Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 5/22/2017.(mpl) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/18 3:21 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred,. Mail sent to Robyn Lynnette Pool. (mxn) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 04/13 2:21 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred, mail sent to Amy Lynn Spencer. No forwarding address (mpl) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/11 9:33 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Gail Judith Higgins. (dsn) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/11 9:32 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to David A. Seeley. (dsn) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 04/07 9:12 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Arthur F. Stocktom. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 4:23 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Steven G. Kaplan. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 3:49 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Jeffrey A. Dickstein. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 3:44 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Gene W. Chang. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 9:21 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Kathleen M. Keefe. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 9:20 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to John Peter Christenson. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/04 9:11 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Brian D. Gard. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Mon 04/03 9:14 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Amy Lynn Spencer. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 03/30 4:44 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Steven G. Kaplan. (dsn) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 03/30 4:43 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Frank Barilla. (dsn) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 03/30 9:57 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to John Peter Christenson. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 03/30 9:56 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Richard D. Huffman, II. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Mail Returned
Wed 03/29 10:30 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Mail sent to Steven M. Gribben. No Forwarding Address. (dsn) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 03/23 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Mailing re1 Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred. Per instructions of Judge Moskowitz, copies of Order to Show Cause have also been sent to attorney's addresses listed in California State Bar Records. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dsn) |
|
1 | 1
order
Order to Show Cause - Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred
Thu 03/23 9:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, In the Matter of Attorneys Suspended or Disbarred by the State of California. The Court orders the listed attorneys to show cause in writing, within 30 days of the service of this order, why they should not be suspended or disbarred from practicing in this Court. Signed by Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz on 3/22/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dsn) |