Moncrief v. Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc. (JOINT ASSIGN)(MAG2)
Alabama Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Myron H Thompson |
Referred: | David A Baker |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00167 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 4:34 AM CDT |
Defendant
Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.
2880 Bob Wallace Avenue
Huntsville, AL 35805 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Moncrief
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Judgment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 11/21 9:47 AM
JUDGMENT: it is the ORDER, JUDGMENT, and DECREE of the court as follows: (1) The parties' 24 joint motion for approval of the proposed settlement is granted and the settlement is approved; (2) Pursuant to the settlement agreement, all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice, with no costs taxed; DIRECTING the clerk to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 FRCP; This case is closed. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2017. (furn: calendar, ag) (term: PTC for 10/11/2018; Jury Trial for 11/19/2018) (alm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Appeals Checklist | ||
26 | 26
7
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion and Order
Tue 11/21 9:05 AM
OPINION. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/21/2017. (alm, ) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 11/17 10:37 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Settlement Conference held on 11/17/2017 (PDF available for court use only). (ag, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Settlement
Wed 11/15 5:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by William Moncrief.(Estes, Chase) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit OT Hours, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Draft Order | ||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/13 2:39 PM
ORDER setting an on-the-record Fairness Hearing on the proposed settlement for 11/17/2017 at 09:00 AM by telephone before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Defense counsel is to arrange for the hearing to be conducted by telephone. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 11/13/2017. (furn: calendar, ag) (wcl, ) |
|
22 | 22
minutes
Telephone Conference
Mon 11/13 10:48 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson: Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2017 (PDF available for court use only). (ag, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 11/13 7:44 AM
Set Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 11/13/2017 10:00 AM before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson. (ag, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
minutes
Mediation Conference
Mon 12/04 10:23 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker: Mediation Conference held on 11/7/2017 (NO PDF ATTACHED). (jct, ) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 08/07 11:48 AM
ORDERED that this matter is set for a mediation conference on Tuesday, November 7, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 5-B, Frank M. Johnson, Jr. United States Courthouse Complex, One Church Street, Montgomery, Alabama. It is further ORDERED that counsel and the parties, or a representative with full authority to settle the case, shall appear at and attend this conference. The parties should be prepared to present documents substantiating any claims for damages. On or before the close of business on Friday, November 3, 2017, each party shall provide the undersigned judge with a confidential mediation conference statement, as further set out. Signed by Honorable Judge Susan Russ Walker on 8/7/2017. (furn: calendar, JT)(kh, ) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/20 10:16 AM
ORDERED that the parties are referred to mediation settlement conference with the Honorable Chief Magistrate Judge Susan Walker; The parties are hereby directed to contact Judge Walker's Chambers at 334-954-3678 within three business days of the date of this order to coordinate scheduling of the mediation; further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by 1/15/2018, regarding the status of the Employee Stock Ownership Plan claim. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 7/20/2017. (furn: Judge Walker, jt) (wcl, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 07/12 11:55 AM
UNIFORM SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/11/2018, at 10:00 AM, in courtroom 2FMJ, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Jury Trial set for 11/19/2018, in Montgomery, AL, before Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson; Dispositive and Daubert Motions due by 5/18/2018; Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2017; Discovery due by 4/20/2018, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 7/12/2017. (furn: calendar, ag) (wcl, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference
Wed 07/12 8:06 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Judge David A. Baker: Status Conference held on 7/11/2017 (PDF available for court use only). (war, ) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 06/07 10:52 AM
ORDER setting Telephone Status Conference for Tuesday, 7/11/2017 at 03:00 PM before Honorable Judge David A. Baker; Each party must be represented by at least one attorney of record, and lead counsel should attend if possible; Counsel are directed to call 334-954-3275 and use passcode 246860# to join the telephone conference; Counsel should be prepared to discuss all aspects of this case including pending motions, if any, and scheduling; ORDERED that for all future motions in this case, the parties are to confer in good faith to resolve any disputes, to stipulate to points of agreement and narrow any remaining issues, and to indicate whether the motion is opposed or agreed to; Responses to motions shall be due fourteen days after the filing of the motion, and any reply to the response within seven days of the filing of the response; Counsel are reminded of the continuing judicial emergency affecting this District and the ability of the parties to consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction to preside over disposition of the case; If there is consent by all parties, counsel should execute and submit the forms as prescribed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Honorable Judge David A. Baker on 6/7/2017. (furn: calendar, cb, jt, kf, wr, ws) (wcl, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 06/06 12:45 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Honorable Judge David A. Baker for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 6/6/2017. (dmn, ) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/05 1:18 PM
Case Reassigned to Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson as presiding judge; Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (wcl, ) |
|
utility
Motions No Longer Referred
Mon 06/05 1:14 PM
Motions No Longer Referred to US Magistrate Judge Capel:8 MOTION to Strike DEMAND for Trial by Jury AS TO COUNT THREE . (No pdf attached to this entry) (wcl, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Tue 05/23 11:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Estes, Chase) |
|
Sunday, May 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause
Sun 05/21 4:49 PM
Reply to response to order to show cause re12 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.. (Stastny, Steven) |
|
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 05/30 3:21 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Strike DEMAND for Trial by Jury AS TO COUNT THREE re1 Complaint filed by Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc13 for pdf - Counsel previously e-filed using wrong civil event "Reply to Response to Show Cause") (wcl, ) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 05/19 1:06 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re8 MOTION to Strike DEMAND for Trial by Jury AS TO COUNT THREE re1 Complaint filed by William Moncrief. (McPhillips, Julian) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 05/10 11:35 AM
ORDERED that, on or before 5/31/2017, Plf shall file a written response and show cause, if any there be, why the8 MOTION to Strike Plf's Demand for Jury Trial in Count Three of Plf's Complaint should not be granted; Dft may file a reply on or before 6/14/2017; ORDERED that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/31/2017; Counsel for the parties are DIRECTED to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the Clerk on or before 5/31/2017; Do NOT electronically file the consent form or reassignment form into the record. Signed by Honorable Judge Wallace Capel, Jr on 5/10/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Fri 04/28 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.. (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Thu 04/27 11:32 AM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.. (Stastny, Steven) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Strike
Thu 04/27 11:31 AM
MOTION to Strike1 Complaint JURY DEMAND AS TO COUNT THREE by Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.. (Stastny, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/27 11:29 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc..(Stastny, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Return Receipt Card
Wed 03/29 1:40 PM
Return Receipt Card showing service of Summons and1 Complaint signed by Dan K. for Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc. served on 3/27/2017, answer due 4/17/2017. (wcl, ) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/27 2:30 PM
Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by William Moncrief re3 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (McPhillips, Julian) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 3:54 PM
Summons Issued as to Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc.; mailed CMRRR with copy of1 Complaint. (wcl, ) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Deficiency Corporate Disc/Conflict Statement
Fri 03/24 3:50 PM
Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to William Moncrief; Corporate Disclosures due by 4/3/2017.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Assignment to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/24 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for William Moncrief. (wcl, ) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 3:48 PM
COMPLAINT against Inline Electric Supply Company, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 4602044674.), filed by William Moncrief.(wcl, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Fri 03/24 3:49 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by William Moncrief. (No pdf attached to this entry - See doc1 for pdf) (wcl, ) |