Shoffner v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00116 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
Fri 08/03 12:38 PM
ORDER granting24 Joint Motion for Attorney Fees (EAJA). The Court awards the Plaintiff $6,958.91 in EAJA fees. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/3/18. (nal) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Attorney Fees
Tue 07/31 11:29 AM
Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees (EAJA) by Plaintiff Patricia L. Shoffner. (Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
11
pgs
order
Opinion and Order
Mon 05/14 10:56 AM
AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: The Court REVERSES and REMANDS this case. Because the Court is remanding on these issues, it need not consider the remainder of the parties' arguments. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/14/2018. (lhc) |
|
Friday, May 04, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Clerks Judgment
Fri 05/04 10:04 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jss) |
|
21 | 21
11
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Fri 05/04 10:03 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court REVERSES and REMANDS this case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/4/2018. (jss) |
|
Sunday, September 10, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice - Other
Sun 09/10 6:26 PM
NOTICE by Patricia L. Shoffner re19 Order,, (Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 08/25 9:11 AM
ORDER: Parties' counsel ORDERED to discuss with each other the issues raised in the Briefs to determine if there is an agreement that the case should be remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings. Within seven (7) calendar days after such discussion, Plaintiff's counsel must file a Notice with the Court confirming the date, time, and outcome of the discussion. In the event no agreement for remand is reached, the Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, will be due fourteen (14) days after the Notice is filed. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/25/17. (cer) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/25 6:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aparna V Srinivasan on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Srinivasan, Aparna) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
ss
Social Security Response Brief of Government
Thu 08/24 4:21 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF re16 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Commissioner of Social Security. (Srinivasan, Aparna) |
|
Saturday, August 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
ss
Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff
Sat 08/12 11:50 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF by Patricia L. Shoffner. (Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/24 11:59 AM
ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief is granted with the following deadlines: The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 8/15/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 9/26/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/10/2017. So Ordered. (mr) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 07/14 11:48 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief by Plaintiff Patricia L. Shoffner. (Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Mon 06/05 2:47 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 6/26/2017. (mr) |
|
12 | 12
order
Order Setting Social Security Deadlines
Mon 06/05 2:47 PM
ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 7/18/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 8/29/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/12/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/5/2017. (mr) |
|
11 | 11
ss
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 06/05 11:23 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF PATRICIA SHOFFNER by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen F Dmetruk, Jr on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Dmetruk, Stephen) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 9:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Jon E DeGuilio no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (rmc) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 3:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Patricia L. Shoffner. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/5/17. (cer) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 3:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Patricia L. Shoffner. US Attorney General served on 4/5/2017. (cer) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 04/10 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Patricia L. Shoffner. US Attorney served on 4/6/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (cer) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 03/27 9:12 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(lhc) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/27 9:11 AM
ORDER GRANTS2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVES the filing fee and (3) DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/27/2017. (cc: USMS) (lhc) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 11:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Fisher on behalf of Patricia L. Shoffner (Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 11:53 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Patricia L. Shoffner.(Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Patricia L. Shoffner.(Fisher, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/24 12:06 PM
Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE, IFP PENDING* (jss) |