Skaggs v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Springmann |
Referred: | Susan L Collins |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00118 |
Nature of Suit | 865 Social Security - RSI (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (RSI) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Fri 06/15 3:02 PM
ORDER granting20 Joint Stipulation for Attorney Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act. The Court GRANTS the relief requested in the Joint Motion and awards the Plaintiff $2,134.42 in EAJA fees. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/15/18. (ksp) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stipulation
Thu 05/17 10:24 PM
Joint STIPULATION For Award of EAJA Fees by Plaintiff Laurie Ann Skaggs. (Rodman, Jason) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Clerks Judgment
Fri 02/16 2:22 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (jss) |
|
18 | 18
12
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Terminate Civil Case
Fri 02/16 2:22 PM
OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Opinion and Order, the Court REVERSES and REMANDS this case for further proceedings consistent with this Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 2/16/2018. (jss) |
|
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice - Other
Sat 12/02 10:23 PM
NOTICE by Laurie Ann Skaggs Confirming Date, Time and Outcome of Ordered Discussion Between Parties (Rodman, Jason) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 10/20 9:33 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS parties' counsel to discuss with each other the issues raised in the briefs to determine if there is an agreement that the case should be remanded to the Social Security Administration for further proceedings. Within seven (7) calendar days after such discussion, Plaintiff's counsel must file a Notice with the Court confirming the date, time, and outcome of the discussion. In the event no agreement for remand is reached, the Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, will be due fourteen (14) days after the Notice is filed. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 10/20/2017. (lhc) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
ss
Social Security Response Brief of Government
Thu 10/19 1:34 PM
RESPONSE BRIEF re14 Social Security Opening Brief of Plantiff by Commissioner of Social Security. (Russell, Mary Ellen) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
ss
Social Security Opening Brief of Plaintiff
Mon 09/18 11:51 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY OPENING BRIEF of Plaintiff by Laurie Ann Skaggs. (Rodman, Jason) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 08/21 12:05 PM
ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Plans unopposed12 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief is granted. The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/18/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 10/30/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 11/13/2017. Text entry order.(mr) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/17 10:12 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Plaintiff Laurie Ann Skaggs. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 07/24 2:09 PM
ENTRY for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief is granted. The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 8/21/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 10/2/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 10/16/2017. So Ordered. (mr) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 07/24 1:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief by Plaintiff Laurie Ann Skaggs. (Forbes, Randal) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated
Mon 06/12 11:10 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. (mr) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order Setting Social Security Deadlines
Mon 06/12 11:10 AM
ORDER that pursuant to Local Rule 7-3, the claimant/plaintiff is directed to file his/her opening brief by the deadline set out below. Failure to do so could result in dismissal of this case pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Briefs under this rule are subject to the page limitations in Local Rule 7-1(e). The Social Security Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 7/24/2017. The Social Security Response Brief of the Government is due by 9/5/2017. The Social Security Reply Brief of the Plaintiff is due by 9/19/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/12/2017. (mr) |
|
7 | 7
ss
Social Security Administrative Record
Mon 06/12 9:55 AM
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF LAURIE SKAGGS by Commissioner of Social Security. (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/07 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Ellen Russell on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Russell, Mary Ellen) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 8:02 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann for all further proceedings. Judge Philip P Simon no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (jld) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 03/27 8:55 AM
Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (lhc) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/27 8:54 AM
Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE* (lhc) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 7:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Laurie Ann Skaggs (Rodman, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/24 7:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Laurie Ann Skaggs (Forbes, Randal) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 7:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3204957.), filed by Laurie Ann Skaggs.(Forbes, Randal) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |