Stafford v. Knight et al
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jon E Deguilio |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00228 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Judgment
Wed 07/05 3:02 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (cer) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/05 2:51 PM
ORDER: This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The filing fee is WAIVED. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/5/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party).(cer) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 05/16 10:54 AM
ORDER: James Blair Stafford filed an unsigned complaint. For the reasons set forth in the Order, the Court STRIKES the1 complaint, GRANTS James Blair Stafford until 6/22/2017, to file an amended complaint and resolve his filing fee status; and CAUTIONS James Blair Stafford, that if he does not respond by the deadline, this case will be dismissed without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/16/17. (cc: pro se party)(jss) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Pro Se Complaint
Fri 03/24 4:24 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Craig Grage, Kathy Griffin, Stan Knight, filed by James Blair Stafford. ***Signature page not included, no filing fee or IFP submitted*** (nae) |