Stafford v. Superintendent
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Withdraw
Fri 06/23 4:45 PM
ORDER:Court GRANTS9 Motion to Withdraw habeas petition and this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Respondent's7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/23/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (tc) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Withdraw
Thu 06/15 4:07 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Petition without Prejudice by Petitioner James Blair Stafford. (jld) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 06/14 1:33 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of7 MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot filed by Superintendent. (Barrow, Frances) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/14 1:33 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Petition as Moot by Respondent Superintendent.(Barrow, Frances) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Report of Disciplinary Hearing, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Reconsideration | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/31 3:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Order to Show Cause by Respondent Superintendent. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/31/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/26 1:14 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Order to Show Cause by Respondent Superintendent. (Barrow, Frances) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 12:26 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Judge William C Lee no longer assigned to case. Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lns) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/24 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Frances H Barrow on behalf of Superintendent (Barrow, Frances) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause - Habeas Corpus
Mon 04/10 8:52 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the respondent to enter an appearance on or before 4/24/2017; and file a response to the petition with the full and complete administrative record by 6/5/2017. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 4/10/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Superintendent)(lhc) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
Fri 03/24 1:41 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt #3017119), filed by James Blair Stafford. (nae) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |