Jemison v. Superintendent
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00231 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 08/29 3:57 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to26 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison This appeal is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b).(jld) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Order | ||
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 08/14 2:17 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison: Upon consideration of the Motion to Withdraw Appeal, filed on 8/7/2017, by the pro se appellant, it is ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of AppellateProcedure 42(b).(nae) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Order, | ||
Att: 2 Circuit Rule 3(b) Fee Notice | ||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Withdraw
Fri 08/11 12:00 PM
MOTION to Withdraw26 Notice of Appeal by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. (jld) (forwarded to USCA) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
USCA Order
Thu 08/10 1:48 PM
ORDER of USCA as to26 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison: In light of Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000), this case may proceedwithout a certificate of appealability. (nae) |
|
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Case Number
Thu 08/10 1:47 PM
USCA Case Number 17-2558 for26 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Tue 08/01 1:18 PM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re26 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (cc: Marjorie E Newell) (nae) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Letter
Thu 08/03 12:31 PM
Letter from Eddie Jemison requesting docket sheet and transcript information sheet. (sent docket sheet and transcript form) (rmc) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Fri 07/28 8:02 AM
ORDER DENYING18 MOTION ASKING THIS COURT TO RECONSIDER IT'S DECISION IN THIS MATTER re 15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion for Hearing, by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/27/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/25 1:47 PM
ORDER DENYING23 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/25/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Tue 08/01 1:06 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion for Hearing,16 Clerks Judgment by Eddie E Jemison. (cc: Jemison) (nae) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/25 11:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. (nae) |
|
22 | 22
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 07/25 11:10 AM
ORDER of USCA transferring IFP to District Court for ruling as to19 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison (nae) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 07/24 9:52 AM
USCA Case Number 17-2464 for19 Notice of Appeal filed by Eddie E Jemison.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Circuit Rule 3(b) Notice | ||
20 | 20
appeal
Short Record Sent to USCA
Wed 07/19 12:10 PM
Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re19 Notice of Appeal. No appeal fees paid. (cc: Marjorie E Newell) (nae) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Notice of Appeal - court user
Wed 07/19 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Order on Motion for Hearing,16 Clerks Judgment by Eddie E Jemison. (cc: Jemison) (nae) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 07/11 9:05 AM
MOTION ASKING THIS COURT TO RECONSIDER IT'S DECISION IN THIS MATTER re15 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. (jld) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 06/27 2:00 PM
"REPLY in Support of Objection to Respondents Motion to Dismiss" re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eddie E Jemison. (nae) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Clerks Judgment
Fri 06/23 10:21 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (cc: pro se party)(jld) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Motion for Hearing
Fri 06/23 10:19 AM
ORDER: GRANTING6 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Marjorie E Newell; and DENYING10 Motion for Hearing; DIRECTING the clerk to treat this matter as closed. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jld) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Response/Reply
Thu 06/22 4:26 PM
"Petitioners Response to: Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss" by Eddie E Jemison to6 MOTION to Dismiss .(nae) (nae). Modified on 6/22/2017 to add corrected documents(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
Att: 2 (6/22/2017) *Corrected Petitioners Response to: Responsent's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 3 (6/22/2017) *Corrected Exhibits, | ||
Att: 4 (6/22/2017) Envelope | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Memorandum of Law
Wed 06/21 9:55 AM
"MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support / Reply to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss", re12 Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Eddie E Jemison.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/21 9:49 AM
REPLY to Respondent's6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eddie E Jemison.(nae) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Document to Petitioners Reply to Respondents Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 06/14 1:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Superintendent.(Craft, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit F-OIS reports | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Hearing
Wed 06/07 12:22 PM
MOTION to Hold Prison Disciplinary Rehearing in Abeyance by Petitioner Eddie E Jemison. (nae) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 05/31 10:29 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Respondent by Respondent Superintendent. (Newell, Marjorie) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/31 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T Craft on behalf of Superintendent (Craft, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Memorandum in Support
Tue 05/30 2:51 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Superintendent. (Newell, Marjorie) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/30 2:37 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Respondent Superintendent.(Newell, Marjorie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Exhibit | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Tue 05/30 2:14 PM
***FILING ERROR, SEE6 FOR CORRECT ENTRY*** MOTION to Dismiss by Respondent Superintendent. Modified on 5/30/2017 (jld) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-Exhibit | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 05/01 12:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Judge Rudy Lozano no longer assigned to case, Magistrate Consent forms due by 5/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 5/1/17. (mlc) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 04/26 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marjorie E Newell on behalf of Superintendent (Newell, Marjorie) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause - Habeas Corpus
Tue 04/11 9:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Respondent Superintendent ORDERED to enter an Appearance by 4/26/2017 and file a Response to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with the full and complete Administrative Record by 6/5/2017. Signed by Judge Rudy Lozano on 4/10/17. (Copy of Order mailed to pro se party; Copy of Order and Petition mailed to Superintendent, Indiana State Prison).(cer) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
Fri 03/24 4:05 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee received $ 5, receipt number 3017120), filed by Eddie E Jemison. (nae) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |