Stafford v. Superintendent
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert L Miller, Jr |
Referred: | Michael G Gotsch, Sr |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00233 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 11, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Clerks Judgment
Tue 09/12 7:39 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Opinion and Order Order Dismissing Case
Tue 09/12 7:38 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. DIRECTING the clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/11/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
Tue 08/01 1:11 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/22/2017. (slm) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Traverse
Thu 06/15 9:55 AM
Traverse (Titled "Response") to:2 Order to Show Cause (Habeas Corpus, filed by James Blair Stafford. (jld) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Fri 06/02 2:02 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Superintendent.(Hunter, Kyle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Report of Conduct, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Screening Report, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Report of Disciplinary Hearing, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D-Disciplinary Hearing Appeal, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E-DOC Appeal, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F-Facility History | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/24 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Hunter on behalf of Superintendent (Hunter, Kyle) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause - Habeas Corpus
Fri 04/07 2:09 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The Court ORDERS the respondent to enter an appearance on or before 4/24/2017; and file a response to the petition with the full and complete administrative record by 6/5/2017. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/7/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party and Superintendent)(lhc) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - court user
Fri 03/24 3:56 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee received $ 5, receipt #3017126), filed by James Blair Stafford. (nae) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope |