Splashlight, LLC v. Lewis et al
Iowa Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie M Rose |
Referred: | Helen C Adams |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00110 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 25, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 4:52 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
James M Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Sarah Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Predictive Health Strategies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Splashlight, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James M Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sarah Lewis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Predictive Health Strategies, LLC
6255 Beachtree Drive, Unit 1202
West Des Moines, IA 50266 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Splashlight, LLC
2700 Westown Pkwy, Suite 315
West Des Moines, IA 50266 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 08/25 11:09 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. See54 Stipulation of Dismissal. (kmc, ) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
55 | 55
order
Order
Thu 08/24 9:36 AM
TEXT ORDER: ORDER CANCELING STATUS CONFERENCE. The parties have filed54 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Accordingly, status conference set for 8/25/2017 is canceled. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/24/2017. (kln) |
|
54 | 54
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/24 9:26 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Splashlight, LLC. (Smith, Patrick) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
53 | 53
order
Order
Fri 08/18 2:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: ORDER CONTINUING STATUS CONFERENCE. By agreement of the parties, status conference in this case is continued to 8/25/2017 at 10:00 AM. Counsel should call (515) 284-6224 and enter access code 116224 at the prompt to be joined with the call. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 8/18/2017. (kln) |