Olstad, Teresa et al v. Chase Auto Finance Corporation et al
Wisconsin Western District Court | |
Judge: | William M Conley |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00236 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 09, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 4:17 AM CDT |
Defendant
Chase Auto Finance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tri State Recovery, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Olstad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Olstad
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 07/09 12:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) - public docket entry
Mon 07/09 2:24 PM
Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), this case is closed without further order of the court. (jat) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/13 2:54 PM
Notice to Counsel. Please disregard 37 Text Only Order. It was docketed in error as this case is currently stayed. (lak) |
|
37 | 37
order
Text Only Order
Tue 03/13 1:53 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court sets the following deadlines: MIL and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures: June 15, 2018 Responses: June 29, 2018 Final Pretrial Conference: July 10, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. For additional information about pretrial submissions, please refer to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order and the most recent version of the attachments to that Order (dkt. #36). In particular, please note that Judge Conley's procedures and timing for filing deposition designations and exhibits have been modified. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 3/13/2018. (voc) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 02/15 4:13 PM
**TEXT ONLY ORDER** Judge Conley recently modified his attachments to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order, which you may access via this hyperlink:[LINK:Attachments to Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order] . Please note that occasionally Judge Conley makes changes to these attachments. As such, unless you do not have access to the attachments electronically (e.g., you are a pro se litigant), you should review the most recent version of the appropriate attachment to assure compliance when preparing summary judgment or other pre-trial submissions. (lak) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 01/22 11:19 AM
OPINION AND ORDER granting25 Defendants' motion to dismiss or stay this action and compel arbitration. Plaintiffs shall have 90 days to initiate arbitration proceedings of their claims in this case, including the arbitrability of their conversion claim. This case is STAYED pending further proceedings in arbitration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 1/22/18. (jat) |
|
utility
Case Stayed
Mon 01/22 11:21 AM
Case Stayed (jat) |
||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Declaration
Fri 01/19 3:05 PM
Declaration of Tanya M. Salman filed by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc. re:33 Motion to Stay (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notices of Depositions, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - DeLaduranteyEmail Dated 1-15-18 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Stay
Fri 01/19 3:01 PM
Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. Response due 1/26/2018. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 01/08 10:00 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer: Settlement Conference held on 1/5/2018 [5:00] during which the parties did not reach a final settlement. (jaf) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 11/30 2:24 PM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in conference room 410 before Magistrate Judge Peter Oppeneer. Any submissions of the parties are due by 1/3/2018 at clerkofcourt@wiwd.uscourts.gov. (jaf) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 10/31 9:40 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Heidi N. Miller terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 10/31/17. (jat) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 10/27 11:50 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. Response due 11/3/2017. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Wed 09/27 11:37 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** Stipulated Motion for Protective Order29 is accepted and entered as the court's order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/17. (jat) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Protective Order
Tue 09/26 4:08 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Brief in Reply
Wed 07/05 5:46 PM
Brief in Reply by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc. in Support of25 Motion to Compel, (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Brief in Opposition
Wed 06/28 5:52 PM
Brief in Opposition by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad re:25 Motion to Compel, filed by Chase Auto Finance Corporation (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/14 7:50 AM
Reset Deadlines as to25 Second Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Action . Brief in Opposition due 6/28/2017. Brief in Reply due 7/5/2017. (jat) |
||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Declaration
Tue 06/13 3:00 PM
Declaration of Deborah S. Kirsling filed by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation re:25 Motion to Compel (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Retail Installment Contract w/ Balloon Pmt Options | ||
25 | 25
motion
Compel
Tue 06/13 2:56 PM
Second Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss or Stay Action by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 6/20/2017. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/06 5:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc., filed by Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Pretrial Conference Order
Thu 06/01 1:54 PM
Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 6/23/2017. Dispositive Motions due 2/23/2018. Settlement Letters due 6/15/2018. Motions in Limine due 6/22/2018. Response to Motion due 7/9/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2018 at 04:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 7/23/2018 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 6/1/17. (jat) |
|
minutes
Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference
Thu 06/01 1:23 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 5/24/2017 [:15] (cak) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/24 8:43 AM
Reset Deadlines as to21 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action . Brief in Opposition due 6/7/2017. Brief in Reply due 6/14/2017. (jat) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Declaration
Tue 05/23 5:47 PM
Declaration of DeborahS. Kirsling filed by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc. re:21 Motion to Compel, (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Retail Installment Contract w Balloon Pmt Options | ||
21 | 21
motion
Compel
Tue 05/23 5:46 PM
Sixth Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 5/30/2017. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Tue 05/23 2:16 PM
Case randomly reassigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (cak) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/19 4:45 PM
Amended ANSWER by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Thu 05/18 3:46 PM
Corrected Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
Wed 05/17 4:16 PM
Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
utility
Set Pretrial or Status Conference
Wed 05/03 7:40 AM
Set Telephone Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2017 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [[LINK:Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference] attached] (jat) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/02 6:14 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/02 5:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/02 5:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Tri State Recovery, Inc.. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/02 5:43 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/02 5:42 PM
ANSWER by Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/02 4:58 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Tanya Mutasim Salman for Defendants Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 04/19 10:59 AM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Tri State Recovery, Inc. answer due 5/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/19/17. (jat) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 04/19 8:29 AM
Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer on Behalf of Tri State Recovery, Inc. by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Stipulation
Tue 04/18 3:22 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** ORDER granting8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/18/17. (jat) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Stipulation
Tue 04/18 1:50 PM
Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Chase Auto Finance Corporation. (Salman, Tanya) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/18 3:22 PM
Reset Deadlines: Chase Auto Finance Corporation answer due 5/2/2017. (jat) |
||
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/12 10:40 AM
Summons Returned Executed. Tri State Recovery, Inc. served on 3/29/2017, answer due 4/19/2017. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/11 10:52 AM
Summons Returned Executed. Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 04/05 1:51 PM
Summons Returned Executed. Chase Auto Finance Corporation served on 3/28/2017, answer due 4/18/2017. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/28 11:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (Usman, Zeshan) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, and Tri State Recovery, Inc. (jls) |
|
utility
Add Judge for Shell Case Opening
Mon 03/27 12:03 PM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls) |
||
utility
Standard Attachments Sent
Mon 03/27 12:03 PM
Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] ,[LINK:Order Regarding Assignment of Cases] ,[LINK:Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment] ,[LINK:Order on Dispositive Motions] . (jls) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/24 2:35 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 2:34 PM
COMPLAINT against Chase Auto Finance Corporation, Primeritus Financial Services, Incorporated, Tri State Recovery, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-1995563.), filed by Ronald Olstad, Teresa Olstad. (Miller, Heidi) |
|
Att: 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Chase Auto Finance Corporation, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Primeritus Financial Services Incorporated, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Tri State Recovery Inc |