Orozco et al v. Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00874 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:45 AM MST |
Defendant
Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marcelino Orozco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexandra Ochoa
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Aluma Systems LLC
Terminated: 03/23/2017
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
46 | 46
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/16 11:58 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Stipulation to Dismiss Case With Prejudice45 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted in this action against Defendant are hereby dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/16/18. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
motion
Dismiss Case
Mon 05/14 1:37 PM
*STIPULATION to Dismiss Case with Prejudice by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC.(Medcoff, Timothy) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 5/14/2018 (SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Case with Prejudice | ||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 03/13 10:01 AM
ORDER granting43 Unopposed Motion to Postpone Dismissal Date. This matter will, without further Order of the Court, be dismissed within 60 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/12/2018. (MMO) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 03/08 4:32 PM
MOTION Postpone Dismissal Date by Alexandra Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco.(Horne, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 08, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 02/08 11:34 AM
ORDER that this matter will, without further Order of this Court, be dismissed within 30 days of the date of this order unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to terminate this matter on 3/16/2018 without further leave of Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 2/8/2018. (MMO) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 02/08 9:10 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 2/6/2018. The parties reached a settlement. The essential terms of the Settlement Agreement have been put forth on the record. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED final execution of the settlement in this case will be completed no later than 03/08/2018. A Stipulation to Dismiss this case with prejudice each side to pay its own costs and fees to be filed with the Court no later than 03/15/2018. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Thomas Horne for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Steven Smelser for Defendant with Client Representatives, Brad Matthiesen and Gina Bartoszek. Hearing held 4:31 PM to 4:47 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESL) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 01/31 2:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Telephonic status hearing re:settlement conference set for 2/6/2018 at 4:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DKD/ah) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 01/16 3:55 PM
ORDER granting38 Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines. FURTHER ORDER denying as moot37 Motion to Postpone Deadline for Expert Disclosure. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 1/16/2018. (MMO) |
|
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 01/12 11:48 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines (2nd Request) by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC.(Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order Deadlines | ||
Thursday, January 11, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Continue
Thu 01/11 11:32 AM
* MOTION to Continue Deadline for Expert Disclosure by Alexandra Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco.(Horne, Thomas) * Modified to delete motion part; attorney noticed on 1/11/2018 (LAD) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
2
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 11/21 11:40 AM
ORDER pursuant to35 Stipulation: Dispositive motions due by 4/20/2018.(See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 11/20/2017. (MMO) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Stipulation
Mon 11/20 11:00 AM
STIPULATION by Alexandra Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco.(Horne, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Thu 11/02 5:03 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Continuation of Settlement Conference held on 11/2/2017. Negotiations are ongoing. The Court will contact the parties the week of November 6, 2017 and report back to the Court via minute entry whether a settlement has been reached in this matter. APPEARANCES: Thomas Horne for Plaintiffs and with Plaintiff, Marcelino Orozco. Steven Smelser for Defendant with Client Representative, Brad Matthiesen. Hearing held 9:00 AM to 1:30 PM. Hearing not recorded. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CIS) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 10/19 1:54 PM
Document was filed in the wrong case. All docket text associated with the entry has been removed on 10/19/2017 (CEI) |
|
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation
Thu 10/19 1:51 PM
ORDER pursuant to31 Stipulation: The deadline for disclosing experts is extended through and including 12/15/2017. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 10/18/2017. (MMO) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/13 11:25 AM
STIPULATION by Alexandra Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco.(Horne, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 10/04 5:07 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The settlement conference set for 10/26/2017 is reset to 11/2/2017 in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Defendant's counsel to appear at 9:00 AM and Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel to appear at 9:30 AM. The Defendant's representative may appear by telephone. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DK/ah) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Settlement Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only) ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 09/28 3:40 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Settlement Conference held on 9/28/2017. The settlement conference this day identified collateral issues that require the consideration by others not attending the settlement conference. Accordingly, the parties will continue these discussions on October 26, 2017. Defendant's counsel to appear at 9:30 a.m. and Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel to appear at 10:00 a.m. The Defendant's representative may appear by telephone. APPEARANCES: Tom Horne with Mark Horne for and with Plaintiffs Marcelino Orozco and Alexandra Ochoa. Steven Smelser for Defendant with client representatives Brad Matthieson and Deborah Pittet. Settlement Conference set for 10/26/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. Hearing held 9:00 AM to 1:50 PM. Hearing not recorded. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CIS) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/28 1:57 PM
NOTICE re: Non-Party at Fault by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC . (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Deposition
Mon 08/21 3:03 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Representative of Suntec Concrete, Inc., filed by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC, Aluma Systems LLC. (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Deposition
Wed 07/26 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Marcelino Orozco, filed by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 07/21 12:36 PM
NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoenas Duces Tecum by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC . (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/13 10:58 AM
NOTICE by Marcelino Orozco . (Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Wed 07/12 10:20 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Amend with Regard to Party Name. The first name of Plaintiff Ochoa shall be reflected on the docket and in all future filings in this matter as "Alexandra." Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/11/2017. (MMO) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 07/06 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Thu 07/06 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 06/23 3:18 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct with Regard to Party Name by Alexandria Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco.(Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/23 11:19 AM
NOTICE re: Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Alexandria Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco . (Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 06/20 8:51 AM
NOTICE re: Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC . (Medcoff, Timothy) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 06/19 4:25 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. (See document for details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/19/2017. (ATD) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/07 10:49 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/5/2017. Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2018. Telephonic Interim Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2018 at 01:45 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/7/2017. (MMO) |
|
15 | 15
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Wed 06/07 10:44 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/7/2017. Deadlines discussed. Order to issue. LATER: Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan is drawn for purposes of conducting a Settlement Conference. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge Duncan's chambers at 602-322-7630 within 10 days to schedule a Settlement Conference. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Thomas Horne for Plaintiffs. Steven Smelser for Defendant. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 9:33 AM to 9:52 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 06/01 1:04 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Appear Telephonically at the Scheduling Conference set on June 7, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/1/2017. (MMO) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/31 3:47 PM
NOTICE re: Of Initial Disclosure by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC . (Rowe, Lucas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Wed 05/31 2:28 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (Rowe, Lucas) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear
Wed 05/31 2:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Marcelino Orozco.(Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 05/31 10:17 AM
NOTICE re: Plaintiff's Notice of Initial Disclosure by Alexandria Ochoa and Marcelino Orozco . (Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
misc
Remark (Public)
Mon 04/24 4:28 PM
Remark: Pro hacs granted for Steven Smelser and Lucas Rowe on behalf of defendant Aluma Systems Construction LLC This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Demand for Jury Trial by Defendant
Thu 04/06 1:52 PM
DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 5:44 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexandria Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco. (Slaton, Sandra) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/05 5:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexandria Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco. (Slaton, Sandra) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/30 4:41 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC.(Bernheim, Robert) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 03/27 11:12 AM
ORDER: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 calendar days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/27/2017. (MMO) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Mon 03/27 11:07 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 3/27/2017. (MMO) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/24 12:26 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14048173. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00874 PHX-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/24 12:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (submitted by Robert Bernheim) (REK) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 12:18 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2017-052594. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-14048173 filed by Aluma Systems Concrete Construction LLC. (submitted by Robert Bernheim)(REK) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Fri 03/24 12:23 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/23/2017*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Alexandria Ochoa, Marcelino Orozco: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Aluma Systems LLC on 2/22/2017.*****Affidavit of Service by Private Process Server filed in State Court on 3/01/2017, docketed in U.S. District Court on 3/23/2017 for case management purposes.***** (REK) |