Bogers v. Johnson Mark LLC
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | John J Tuchi |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00882 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:35 AM MST |
Defendant
Johnson Mark LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shelby Bogers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case Order on Stipulation
Tue 11/14 8:22 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the Stipulation (Doc.33 ). The above-entitled matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 11/13/17. (SLQ) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/09 4:08 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Shelby Bogers.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 09/18 2:37 PM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that this matter will be dismissed with prejudice 45 days after the docketing of this order unless the parties file a stipulation to dismiss prior to that date. The settlement constitutes an accord which has extinguished the underlying claim. All pending hearings and motions are deemed moot. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 9/18/17. (JAMA) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice of Settlement
Fri 09/15 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Shelby Bogers. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 08/22 4:06 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to28 Amended Complaint by Johnson Mark LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Saturday, August 19, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Deposition
Sat 08/19 3:10 PM
NOTICE of Deposition of Defendant's Designated Representive, filed by Shelby Bogers. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 08/09 1:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Johnson Mark LLC filed by Shelby Bogers.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Fri 08/04 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 08/03 11:05 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (Doc.16 ). Plaintiff shall file her Amended Complaint on the docket by August 7, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying as moot Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc.12 ). (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/3/17.(JAMA) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/05 11:10 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/27 10:39 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Johnson Mark LLC. (JAMA) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 06/14 12:46 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Shelby Bogers. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/08 3:23 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Johnson Mark LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Flores Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint Presented to Defendant for Stipulation on May 22 2017, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Judgment in underlying state action | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 06/05 3:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/8/2017. Dispositive motions due by 10/13/2017. (See attached Order for additional deadlines and details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/5/17. (JAMA) |
|
20 | 20
minutes
Scheduling Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Mon 06/05 3:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge John J Tuchi: Scheduling Conference held on 6/5/2017. Deadlines discussed and entered. Scheduling Order to follow. APPEARANCES: David McGlothlin for Plaintiff. Rhett Montgomery Flaming-Buschman for Defendant. (Court Reporter Elaine Cropper.) Hearing held 2:58 PM to 3:10 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JAMA) |
|
Saturday, June 03, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sat 06/03 5:32 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 05/30 1:36 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re:12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Shelby Bogers. (McGlothlin, David) |
|
Sunday, May 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)
Sun 05/28 7:01 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 05/25 3:45 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Shelby Bogers.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Proposed First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Redlined Version of First Amended Complaint | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Order on Stipulation
Fri 05/19 10:22 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the parties' Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendant's Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc.14 ). Plaintiff has until May 30, 2017, to file a response to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc.12 ). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 5/19/17. (JAMA) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/18 8:51 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time for Plaintiff to Respond to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Shelby Bogers.(McGlothlin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Service of Discovery
Mon 05/15 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Johnson Mark LLC. (Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 05/09 2:42 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Johnson Mark LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/21 11:33 AM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi. The parties shall submit their joint proposed case management plan not less than seven (7) days before the Scheduling Conference. All parties are required to appear in person at the hearing. No extensions will be granted. (See attached Order for additional details). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 4/21/17. (JAMA) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/18 7:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson Mark LLC.(Flaming-Buschman, Rhett) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 04/14 8:25 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on June 23, 2017. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 4/14/17. (CLB) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Fri 04/14 8:23 AM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge John J. Tuchi on 4/14/17. (CLB) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
minute_ord
Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings
Thu 04/13 3:58 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge John J Tuchi. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 17-00882 PHX-JJT. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for May 8, 2017 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
6 | 6
misc
25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge
Thu 04/13 3:56 PM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b))
Mon 04/10 10:03 AM
Order that Shelby Bogers show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/8/2017 at 04:30 PM before Judge G Murray Snow.(MAP) |
|
Att: 1 Instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Consent Form | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Johnson Mark LLC. (KGM) |
|
3 | 3
misc
New Case Opened
Fri 03/24 2:27 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14052697. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00882 PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached.(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 MAG 25 Instructions | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Submitted
Fri 03/24 2:25 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Shelby Bogers (submitted by David McGlothlin). (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14052697 filed by Shelby Bogers (submitted by David McGlothlin).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |