Glover-Russell #802106 v. Ryan et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | G Murray Snow |
Referred: | James F Metcalf |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00886 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 12, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Judgment
Mon 06/12 3:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed April 24, 2017, judgment of dismissal is entered. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (LAD) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 05/02 11:47 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. Reason for return: Inactive. Document number 7. (SLQ) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 04/25 12:05 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. Reason for return: No longer at this unit. Document number7 . (SLQ) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/24 2:58 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Doc.3 ) is denied without prejudice. If Plaintiff fails to either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or file a complete Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/24/17. (SLQ) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Mail Returned
Tue 03/28 12:55 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. Reason for return: Transferred. Document number1 .(SLQ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Change of Address Form | ||
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment
Fri 03/24 4:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (LAD) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice: Prisoner Case Subject to Electronic Filing
Fri 03/24 4:02 PM
NOTICE: This case is subject to electronic filing. Please review the attached documents. (LAD) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 3:58 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. (LAD) (2 pages) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 03/24 3:57 PM
Exhibits to Main Document re:1 Complaint by Plaintiff Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. (LAD) (3 pages) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 3:56 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Isaac Glover-Russell, Jr. (LAD) (6 pages) |