Woodside Village v. James R Collins et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Gail J Standish |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02205 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 17, 2017 1:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
James R Collins
651 Durham Ln No A
Ventura, CA 93004 |
|
Defendant
Cari L Cross
|
|
Defendant
James R Cross
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Woodside Village
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Receipt
Tue 04/18 10:14 AM
Receipt of Order of Remand filed. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 03/30 11:49 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward L Laird counsel for Plaintiff Woodside Village. Adding Barry G. Coleman as counsel of record for Woodside Village for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Woodside Village. (Laird, Edward) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Thu 03/30 11:44 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward L Laird counsel for Plaintiff Woodside Village. Robert M. Crissman is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Woodside Village. (Laird, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 03/29 9:11 AM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Percy Anderson, re EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Remanding Case to State Court 6 . On March 28, 2017, the Court on its own motion remanded this action to state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Accordingly, plaintiff's ex parte application to remand this action is denied as moot. (mrgo) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 2:30 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
order
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 03/28 2:03 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court sua sponte REMANDS this action to the California Superior Court for the County of for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case is remanded to Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, Case number 56-02017 00492236. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (mailed 3/28/17) (lom) |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/28 2:00 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby: REMANDED. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw Motion/Application/Request/Ex Parte Application Order
Mon 03/27 12:36 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Withdraw , EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for Remanding Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Woodside Village. (Attorney Edward L Laird added to party Woodside Village (pty:pla)) (Laird, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Remanding Case to State Court | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (car) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Fri 03/24 4:24 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis With Declaration in Support filed by Defendant James R Collins. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 4:23 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant James R Collins (car) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Ventura, case number 56-2017 00492236-CL-UD-VTA with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish, filed by Defendant James R Collins. (car) |