HVH Inc. v. Rocio Melgarejo et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Suzanne H Segal |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02244 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:28 AM PDT |
Defendant
All Occupants in Possession
|
|
Defendant
Arastu
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Rocio Melgarejo
18410 Cantara Street Unit 1
Reseda, CA 91335 |
|
Defendant
Anri Tabatadze
|
|
Plaintiff
HVH Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Receipt
Wed 04/05 2:38 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 10:19 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Northwest District., Van Nuys Courthouse East A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Northwest District. (jp) |
|
5 | 5
order
Remand Case to State Court
Mon 03/27 10:17 AM
MINUTE (In Chambers): ORDER REMANDING CASE TO CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 9:55 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 9:51 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rocio Melgarejo. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 9:50 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 17B00467 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Suzanne H Segal. Filing fee $400:PAID, filed by defendant Rocio Melgarejo. (ghap) |
|
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 10:00 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendant Rocio Melgarejo. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/28/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1)(ghap) |