Tom Redfern v. Rhoda Whitmore et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02250 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2017 1:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
Walter Bunkley
3450 Maricopa St No 65
Torrance, CA 90503 |
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Rhoda Whitmore
|
|
Defendant
Sharinda Williams
3450 Maricopa St No 65
Torrance, CA 90503 |
|
Plaintiff
Tom Redfern
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Receipt
Tue 04/11 11:25 AM
Receipt of remand by Los Angeles Superior Court, Long Beach on 4/3/17 (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 3:38 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California. (lom) |
|
7 | 7
order
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 03/28 3:37 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this matter be, and hereby is, REMANDED to the Superior Court of California for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Case remanded to Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, Case number 17F00519 Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (mailed 3/28/17) (lom) |
|
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/28 3:34 PM
ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED (see comments above). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby REMANDED to state court. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 7:56 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 7:55 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 03/24 7:55 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) filed by Defendant Sharinda Williams. (et) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 7:50 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Sharinda Williams. (et) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 7:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA for the County of Los Angeles-Long Beach Ct, case number 17F00519 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar., filed by Defendant Sharinda Williams. (et) |
|
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/24 7:50 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER-UNLAWFUL DETAINER to Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendants Walter Bunkley, Sharinda Williams. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 2/23/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](et) |