Shirley Lindsay v. Tarzana Health Systems, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02301 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:15 AM PDT |
Defendant
Peter J. Brugetti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Tarzana Health Systems, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Bancorp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Lindsay
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Peter J. Brugetti
|
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Tarzana Health Systems, LLC
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
U.S. Bancorp
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 53 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/28 4:20 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to with prejudice filed by Planitiff Shirley Lindsay.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/09 1:48 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Tarzana Health Systems, LLC.(Kanani, Navid) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 06/02 3:14 PM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson, Setting deadlines and hearings: Discovery cut-off set for 11/27/2017. Motions due by 12/4/2017, Bench Trial set for 2/6/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. See order for details. (shb) |
|
33 | 33
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 06/02 10:27 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is not necessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates attached to this order. The scheduling conference currently on calendar for June 12, 2017, at 10:30 a.m., is hereby vacated, and the matter taken off calendar. This case is referred to the Courts Mediation Panel ( Last Day for Hearing on Motion to Amend Pleadings or Add Parties by 8/28/2017., Discovery cut-off 11/27/2017., Court Trial set for 2/6/2018 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson., Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2018 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (see attached for further details (pj) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 06/01 5:14 PM
NOTICE and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Peter J. Brugetti, (Kanani, Navid) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 06/01 5:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Peter J. Brugetti.(Kanani, Navid) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/01 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal of Third Party Complaint by US Bancorp U.S. Bancorp. (Kanani, Navid) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 05/26 3:33 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay.. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Substitute Attorney
Tue 05/23 2:38 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY by Judge Percy Anderson: granting27 Request to Substitute Attorney Navid Kanani for U.S. Bancorp as attorney of record instead of Attorneys Julie Ann Hamlin and Benjamin R Trachtman. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Fri 05/19 2:21 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Navid Kanani in place of attorney Benjamin R. Trachtman and Julie A. Hamlin filed by Defendant and Third-Party Plaintiff U.S. Bancorp. (Trachtman, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Mon 05/15 12:59 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE CLERKS ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST PETER J. BRUGETTI25 by Judge Percy Anderson. Plaintiff SHIRLEY LINDSAY ("Plaintiff"), and Defendant PETER J. BRUGETTI ("Defendants") by and through their attorneys of record, having stipulated that the Clerks Entry of Default against Defendant PETER J. BRUGETTI is set aside, Defendant PETER J. BRUGETTI shall have twenty days after the date of this order to file his answer to the complaint. (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Set Aside Default
Wed 05/10 12:34 PM
STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Peter J. Brugetti Peter J. Brugetti.(Attorney Navid Kanani added to party Peter J. Brugetti(pty:dft))(Kanani, Navid) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Set Aside Default | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 05/04 5:34 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, re Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings19 Scheduling Meeting of Counsel [FRCO 16, 26(f)] onto Tarzana Health Systems, LLC, Peter J. Brugetti and U.S. Bancorp served on May 4, 2017. (Potter, Mark) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/01 4:07 PM
NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Tarzana Health Systems, LLC, identifying Shirley Lindsay, Peter Brugetti, US Bancorp. (Kanani, Navid) |
|
22 | 22
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 05/01 3:57 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Tarzana Health Systems, LLC answer now due 6/9/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 filed by Defendant Tarzana Health Systems, LLC.(Attorney Navid Kanani added to party Tarzana Health Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Kanani, Navid) |
|
21 | 21
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Mon 05/01 2:44 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Peter J. Brugetti. (mrgo) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/28 4:53 PM
ORDER RE SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)];SCHEDULING CONFERENCEset for June 12, 2017 at 10:30 a.m by Judge Percy Anderson (lc) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 04/28 3:33 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Peter J. Brugetti filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Phyl Grace, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/28 3:52 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]by Judge Percy Anderson, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/12/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (pj) |
|
17 | 17
cmp
Third Party Complaint
Thu 04/27 5:10 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Peter J. Brugetti, Tarzana Health Systems, LLC, filed by Third-Party Plaintiff U.S. Bancorp.(Trachtman, Benjamin) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Thu 04/27 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Peter J. Brugetti13 . The name on the Request for Default is (as to Jay Peter J. Brugetti only). The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: The name of the person served does not exactly match the person named in complaint. (shb) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 04/27 10:50 AM
NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant U.S. Bancorp, identifying U.S. Bancorp; Shirley Lindsay; Tarzana Health Systems, LLC; Peter J. Brugetti; and Greenbridge Investment Partners, Inc.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 04/27 10:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant U.S. Bancorp.(Attorney Benjamin R Trachtman added to party U.S. Bancorp(pty:dft))(Trachtman, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Wed 04/26 3:05 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Peter J. Brugetti filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Phyl Grace, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of service | ||
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/18 12:01 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Tarzana Health Systems, LLC served on 4/16/2017, answer due 5/8/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: FAREED KANANI in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 04/14 9:59 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant U.S. Bancorp served on 4/6/2017, answer due 4/27/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for service: C.T. Corporation System - Daisy Montegegro in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 04/13 12:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, upon Defendant Peter J. Brugetti served on 4/4/2017, answer due 4/25/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PETER J BRUGETTI in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Mon 03/27 11:53 AM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
order
Order
Mon 03/27 11:46 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 4:35 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Peter J. Brugetti, Tarzana Health Systems, LLC, U.S. Bancorp. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:32 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 4:32 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 7:21 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 7:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 7:10 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 7:08 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19568426 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shirley Lindsay. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Shirley Lindsay(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |