Maribel Gonzalez et al v. FCA US LLC, et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02302 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 15, 2020 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maribel Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfredo Palacios
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Champion Dodge, LLC
Terminated: 03/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 15, 2020 | ||
56 | 56
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 07/15 11:10 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. The stipulation is approved. The entire action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. re Stipulation to Dismiss Case55 . (vm) |
|
55 | 55
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 07/15 9:37 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Maribel Gonzalez, Alfredo Palacios.(Mikhov, Steve) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order |