David I. Donner et al v. FCA US LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02303 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
FCA US LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David I. Donner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathleen A. Donner
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
David Ellis Chrysler, Inc.
Terminated: 03/24/2017
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
118 | 118
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 09/25 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 5/15/19 9:24 A.M. re Transcript117 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) |
|
117 | 117
transcript
-Transcript
Wed 09/25 10:27 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 5/15/19 9:24 A.M.. Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2019. (clo) |
|
116 | 116
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 09/25 10:18 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 3/13/19 9:28 A.M. re Transcript115 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clo) |
|
115 | 115
transcript
-Transcript
Wed 09/25 10:17 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 3/13/19 9:28 A.M.. Electronic Court Recorder: BABYKIN COURTHOUSE SERVICES, phone number (626) 963-0566. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/11/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/21/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/19/2019. (clo) |