Daniel Lopez v. Kaivan Nownejad et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02309 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:09 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Kennedy Health Center, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kaivan Nownejad
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Alan Yudkowsky
Law Offices of Alan Z. Yudkowsky 26500 West Agoura Road, Suite 223
Calabasas, CA 91302 |
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/31 3:34 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to F.R.CIV.P. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii), dismissed with prejudice filed by plaintiff Daniel Lopez.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Thu 12/14 10:53 AM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Alan Yudkowsky: Mediation held on December 7, 2017 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Yudkowsky, Alan) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 12/12 10:03 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re Notice of Settlement22 : The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. Please refer to the Court's order for additional information. (cr) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Settlement
Mon 12/11 2:05 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Planitiff Daniel Lopez.(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Tue 10/10 12:22 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 5-4.3.1, documents filed electronically must be submitted in Portable Document Format ("PDF"), created using word-processing software, and published to PDF from the original word-processing file to permit the electronic version of the document to be searched. Other than signature pages, PDF IMAGES CREATED BY SCANNING PAPER DOCUMENTS ARE PROHIBITED. Violation of Local Rule 5-4.3.1 may result in the striking of the offending document and the imposition of monetary or other sanctions. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11)
Wed 08/23 9:53 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Alan Yudkowsky has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (mb) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Mon 08/14 12:16 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Alan Z. Yudkowsky may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez(Grace, Phyl) |
|
Sunday, July 09, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/10 11:06 AM
CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER [FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b)] by Judge Percy Anderson. (Discovery cut-off 1/15/2018. Motions due by 1/22/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2018 at 09:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/06 10:10 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court has received the parties joint 26(f) report and finds that a scheduling conference is notnecessary. Dates set by the Court in this action are listed in the "Schedule of Trial and Pretrial Dates" attached to this order. The dates set by the Court are firm dates. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 01:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 3/27/2018 at 09:00 AM. Please refer to the Court's order for specifics. (cr) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Mon 07/03 1:12 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez.. (Price, Dennis) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Fri 06/02 2:30 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),13 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 06/01 3:25 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Percy Anderson.) (mrgo) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 05/31 3:36 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Kennedy Health Center, Inc, Kaivan Nowneja , Kaivan Nownejad(in individual ).(Attorney Ramin Joseph Kerendian added to party Kaivan Nownejad(pty:dft))(Kerendian, Ramin) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 05/02 3:27 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Kaivan Nowneja answer now due 5/31/2017; Kennedy Health Center, Inc answer now due 5/31/2017; Kaivan Nownejad(in individual ) answer now due 5/31/2017, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants Kaivan Nowneja; Kennedy Health Center, Inc.(Attorney R Joseph Kerendian added to party Kennedy Health Center, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney R Joseph Kerendian added to party Kaivan Nownejad(pty:dft))(Kerendian, R) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/10 8:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez, upon Defendant Kaivan Nowneja served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017; Kaivan Nownejad(in individual ) served on 4/10/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaivan Nownejad, in individual and representative capacity as trustee of the Kaivan Nownejad 2015 Trust; in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/10 8:51 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez, upon Defendant Kennedy Health Center, Inc served on 4/8/2017, answer due 5/1/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Kaivan Nownejad in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order
Mon 03/27 12:13 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Mon 03/27 12:11 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 5:53 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Kennedy Health Center, Inc, Kaivan Nowneja , Kaivan Nownejad(in individual ). (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 5:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 11:16 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Handy, Russell) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 11:15 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Daniel Lopez, (Handy, Russell) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 11:13 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Handy, Russell) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 11:11 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19570598 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Daniel Lopez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Daniel Lopez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) |