Winonia S. Myles v. World Savings Bank, FSB et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Beverly Reid O'Connell |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02317 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1444 Notice of Removal - Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
All Persons Known and Unknown
|
|
Defendant
World Savings Bank, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Winonia S. Myles
2039 S. Victoria Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90016 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued
Wed 06/21 11:48 AM
APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs DENIED. No determination of prevailing party made by the court. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiff Winonia S. Myles16 (kr) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59)
Fri 05/12 10:15 AM
APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiff Winonia S. Myles filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1))
Tue 05/02 4:15 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal Pursuant to FRCP 41(a) or (c) filed by plaintiff Winonia S. Myles that this action is dismissed in its entirety. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Thu 04/20 12:53 PM
DECLARATION of Jeremy E. Shulman re Objection/Opposition (Motion related)13 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
13 | 13
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 04/20 12:37 PM
Opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court12 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Tue 04/18 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Winonia S. Myles. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (jloz) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
For Judicial Notice
Mon 04/03 6:12 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint 10 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Part 4 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 04/03 6:08 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2017 at 01:30 PM before Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/30 2:07 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) |
|
8 | 8
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/30 12:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form4 , Reassign Case - Self-Recusal - pursuant to GO 16-05 (CV-52),7 served on 3/29/2017. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 16-05 (CV-52)
Wed 03/29 3:56 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Case transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-02317 BRO(FFMx). (rn) |
|
6 | 6
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/29 2:11 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 4:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 1:25 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant World Savings Bank, FSB, identifying Wells Fargo & Company. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 1:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant World Savings Bank, FSB. (Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC633295 Receipt No: 0973-19572013 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant World Savings Bank, FSB. (Attorney Jeremy E Shulman added to party World Savings Bank, FSB(pty:dft))(Shulman, Jeremy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - H to Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 2:41 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants All Persons Known and Unknown, Does 1 to 10, Inclusive, World Savings Bank, FSB, filed by Plaintiff Winonia S. Myles. (esa) |