Michelle Patean-Villa v. Target Corporation et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02326 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Target Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michelle Patean-Villa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/22 2:22 PM
ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner, re Stipulation to Dismiss Case11 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action be and hereby is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1). Each party to bear his, her, its own fees and costs, including, but not limited to, attorney's fees, experts' fees, and any other costs associated with the litigation of this case, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 06/21 3:12 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Werbin, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Protective Order
Thu 06/01 10:39 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: PARTIES' PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. The Court has received and considered the parties' proposed Stipulated Protective Order ("Protective Order").9 The Court is unable to adopt the Protective Order as stipulated to by the parties for the followings reasons: The Court may only enter a protective order upon a showing of good cause. Phillips v. G.M. Corp., 307 F.3d 1206, 1209 (9th Cir. 2002) (Rule 26(c) requires a showing of "good cause" for a protective order); Makar-Wellbon v. Sony Electronics, Inc., 187 F.R.D. 576, 577 (E.D.Wis. 1999) (even stipulated protective orders require good cause showing). The parties' stipulation fails to include sufficient statements to demonstrate good cause for issuing the protective order. In any revised stipulated protective order submitted to the Court, the parties must include a statement demonstrating good cause for entry of a protective order pertaining to the documents or information described in the order. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION) (gr) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Protective Order
Wed 05/31 2:58 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Target Corporation.(Werbin, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 2:14 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for July 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pso) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/28 11:28 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 5:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 5:08 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 3:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION, identifying TARGET CORPORATION. (Werbin, Anthony) |
|
3 | 3
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/24 3:41 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on March 24, 2017.(Werbin, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Removal w Exhibits | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 3:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant TARGET CORPORATION. (Werbin, Anthony) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC648423 Receipt No: 0973-19573028 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant TARGET CORPORATION. (Attorney Anthony William Werbin added to party TARGET CORPORATION(pty:bkmov))(Werbin, Anthony) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stmt of Damages, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Business Search | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 5:01 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Target Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Michelle Patean-Villa. Filed in State Court on 1/27/17 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal (car) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 5:03 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Target Corporation. Filed in State Court on 3/24/17 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal(car) |