Apollo Enterprise Solutions, Inc. v. Lantern Credit, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andre Birotte Jr |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02331 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:41 AM PDT |
Counter Claimant
Lantern Credit, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Apollo Enterprise Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Lantern Credit, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Apollo Enterprise Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 03/16 8:32 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CIVIL ACTION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. THE COURT having been advised by counsel that the above-entitled action has been settled54 ; IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 14 days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and the settlement agreement, and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |