Paul S. Clemente et al v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Frederick F Mumm |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00553 |
Nature of Suit | 870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant) |
Cause | 26:7422 IRS: Refund Taxes |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:42 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul S. Clemente
14329 Stone Creek Trl
Hesperia, CA 92344 |
|
Plaintiff
Wilhelmine Kraus
14329 Stone Creek Trl
Hesperia, CA 92344 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 10/23 9:16 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) with Prejudice filed by Defendant United States of America.(Rochmes, Paul) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/08 4:37 PM
ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue12 , re Stipulation to Continue12 . (Status Conference continued to 10/23/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson.) (mrgo) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Continue
Thu 09/07 8:57 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from 09/25/2017 at 3:00 pm to 10/23/2017 at 3:00 pm filed by Defendant United States of America.(Rochmes, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing Initial Status Conference | ||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 07/14 2:22 PM
ORDER Continuing Initial Status Conference by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Continue10 . GOOD CAUSE APPEARING, it is hereby ordered that the Initial Status Conference, which had been set for July 31, 2017 at 3:00 p.m., shall be continued to September 25, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (smo) |
|
10 | 10
stip
Continue
Fri 07/14 10:23 AM
STIPULATION to Continue Initial Status Conference from July 31, 2017 to September 25, 2017 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Rochmes, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing Initial Status Conference | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 06/26 1:12 PM
ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 7/31/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Fri 06/23 12:03 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Rochmes, Paul) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Thu 05/18 11:30 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Paul S. Clemente, Wilhelmine Kraus, upon Defendant United States of America served on 4/4/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by certified mail, return receipt - signature illegible. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by certified mail - return receipt - signature is illegible. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by certified mail - no return receipt. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached as to US Attorney's Office and Attorney General, Washington DC. (lom) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 05/01 9:21 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/26/2017, re Complaint - (Discovery),1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Paul H Rochmes added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Rochmes, Paul) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/24 11:27 AM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 9:15 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 9:10 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Paul S. Clemente, Wilhelmine Kraus. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 9:09 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery),1 as to Defendant United States of America. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/24 9:08 AM
COMPLAINT against Defendant United States of America. Case assigned to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm.(Filing fee $ 400:PAID), filed by plaintiffs Paul S. Clemente, Wilhelmine Kraus. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71 |