Jeff Allen Gooding v. Nancy A. Berryhill
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Steve Kim |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00565 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
judgmentCV
Judgment
Mon 03/12 5:03 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. It is the judgment of this Court that the decision of the Administrative Law Judge is AFFIRMED. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of Defendant. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (clee) |
|
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Mon 03/12 5:00 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AFFIRMING DECISION OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Based on the foregoing, it is ORDERED that the decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Joint Stipulation for Social Security Cases
Fri 11/17 8:11 AM
JOINT STIPULATION, on behalf of both parties, for Disposition of Claim from Relief From Decision of the Commissioner, filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
respoth
Administrative Record
Thu 08/24 9:40 AM
CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Att: 1 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1, | ||
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2, | ||
Att: 10 Medical Records Part 3 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 08/24 9:30 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill.(Turk, Jean) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 07/13 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING SERVICE OF CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Turk, Jean) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/12 9:40 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV17-565 SK on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Amended Document (Non-Motion)
Wed 06/07 2:45 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding. Amendment to Notice of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A),,11 (Lee, Shanny) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A)
Thu 06/01 9:47 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) - Non-Final10 . The following error(s) was found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (sn) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA)
Wed 05/31 7:37 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding. (Lee, Shanny) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed as to USA (60 days)
Thu 04/27 10:53 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 4/17/2017, answer due 6/16/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned.(Lee, Shanny) |
|
Att: 1 Certified Mail Receipts | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Tue 04/25 11:44 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by DEFENDANT Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Jean M Turk added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Turk, Jean) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 03/28 12:16 PM
ORDER re: Procedures in Social Security Appeal (Joint Submission Format) by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. Plaintiff will promptly serve the summons and complaint on the government in accordance with Rule 4(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff will file an appropriate proof of service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Government counsel must file a notice of appearance within 30 days of service of the action. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (mkr) |
|
Att: 1 Consent Form | ||
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/27 2:18 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 03/24 6:53 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding. (Lee, Shanny) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 6:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Lee, Shanny) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 6:48 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding. (Lee, Shanny) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 6:47 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19568407 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeff Allen Gooding. (Attorney Shanny J Lee added to party Jeff Allen Gooding(pty:pla))(Lee, Shanny) |