S.H. et al v. Garfied Beach CVS LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Jay C Gandhi |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00541 |
Nature of Suit | 362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Medical Malpractice |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Garfied Beach CVS LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
S. H.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 09/06 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff S. H.(a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Shannon Ambuehi). Dismissal is with prejudice. (Silberberg, Marshall) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 09/06 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Proof of Annuity Purchase filed by plaintiff S. H.(a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Shannon Ambuehi). (Silberberg, Marshall) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Mon 04/09 1:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney granting17 APPLICATION to Seal Document IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the application of Defendants is GRANTED and the following documents are to be placed under seal: Plaintiff, S. H., a minor, by and through her guardian ad litem, Shannon Ambuehl's Petition to Approve the Compromise of Pending Action and Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for a Minor. IT IS SO ORDERED. (see document for details) (dro) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Mon 04/02 3:20 PM
APPLICATION to file document under seal filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Garfied Beach CVS LLC.(Attorney Brian Robert Hill added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Robert Hill added to party Garfied Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Hill, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Redacted Document, | ||
Att: 4 Unredacted Document | ||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Settlement
Mon 03/12 10:33 PM
ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Re PETITION for Settlement15 (mt) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Settlement
Thu 03/08 4:50 PM
PETITION for Settlement Approval of minor's settlement filed by plaintiff S. H.(a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Shannon Ambuehi). (Silberberg, Marshall) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order to approve minor's settlement | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - form only -no proceeding held
Fri 09/08 10:59 AM
ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT PROCEDURES, PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (mku) |
|
13 | 13
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Fri 09/08 10:21 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Discovery cut-off 6/28/2018. Motions due by 8/27/2018. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 7/31/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2018 at 3:00 p.m. Jury Trial set for 10/9/2018 at 8:30 a.m. (mku) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 08/25 3:41 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7-10, filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Garfied Beach CVS LLC.. (Warren, Marissa) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 06/16 5:22 PM
NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on September 8, 2017. (mku) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Protective Order
Thu 05/25 11:54 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi re Stipulation for Protective Order8 . (kh) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Lodging
Fri 05/19 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Stipulation for Protective Order8(Warren, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Re Stipulation for Protective Order | ||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Protective Order
Tue 05/16 2:51 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Garfied Beach CVS LLC.(Warren, Marissa) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 04/04 5:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Garfied Beach CVS LLC, of Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court and to the Other Parties of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) served on 03/24/2017.(Warren, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Certificate of Service of Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court and to Other Parties of Removal to Federal Court Under 28 U.S.C. 1441(b) | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/30 4:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendants Garfied Beach CVS LLC.(Warren, Marissa) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 8:23 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 8:23 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Jay C. Gandhi. (et) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/24 2:34 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant All Defendants, identifying CVS Health Corporation. (Warren, Marissa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 2:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy Inc., GARFIELD BEACH CVS, L.L.C., a Rhode Island limited liability company. (Warren, Marissa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 2:27 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 30-2017 00899953-CU-MM-CJC Receipt No: 0973-19572684 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy Inc., GARFIELD BEACH CVS, L.L.C., a Rhode Island limited liability company. (Attorney Marissa Ann Warren added to party CVS Pharmacy Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marissa Ann Warren added to party GARFIELD BEACH CVS, L.L.C., a Rhode Island limited liability company(pty:dft))(Warren, Marissa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhi B - Service of Process, pleadings, orders and other papers, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh C - Business Seach Entity Detail re CVS Pharmacy, Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh D - Business Seach Entity Detail re Garfield Beach CVS L.L.C., | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh E - Jury Verdict re Estrada, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh F - Jury Verdict re Washington, | ||
Att: 7 Declaration Declaration in Suport of Removal | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 8:20 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Garfied Beach CVS LLC.. Does 1 through 30, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs S. H.(a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Shannon Ambuehi), S. H.(a minor, by and through her Guardian ad Litem Tanja Rosenbach). [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/26/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #1] (et) |