Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company v. Lobby Traffic Systems, Inc.et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00543 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Cross Claimant
USS Cal Builders, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Lobby Traffic Systems Inc
|
|
Cross Defendant
Roes
|
|
Defendant
Arch Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe 1 through Doe 4
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey David Haden,
|
|
Defendant
Lobby Traffic Systems, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
USS Cal Builders, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Edward D Lodgen
|
|
Plaintiff
Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Cross Defendant
Wesco Insurance Company
Terminated: 08/02/2017
|
|
Defendant
Wesco Insurance Company
Terminated: 06/09/2017
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 13, 2019 | ||
87 | 87
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 03/13 11:44 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re Judgment,,78 entered In favor of Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company Against Jeffrey David Haden,, In favor of Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company Against Lobby Traffic Systems, Inc. FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT filed by Plaintiff Construction Laborers Trust Funds for Southern California Administrative Company. (Hamasaki, Marsha) |