Miguel Quevedo v. Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00547 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:41 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Quevedo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order
Thu 08/03 12:35 PM
ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. The Court, having considered the Parties' Joint Stipulation to dismiss the present action, and with good cause appearing, the Court hereby orders as follows: Plaintiff's individual claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Further, Plaintiff's putative class claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. (dv) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 07/31 4:25 PM
First STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement of Case filed by Plaintiff Miguel Quevedo.(Mauro, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 06/08 2:16 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Staying Action Pending Final Settlement and REmoving Case From Active Caseload by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. On June 8, 2017, counsel filed a "Joint Notice of Settlement"15 . The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case stayed pending final settlement. It is further ordered that this action is removed from the Court's active caseload, subject to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. Counsel shall file settlement documents and/or a dismissal with this Court by July 31, 2017. The Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this order shall not prejudice any party in the action. All hearing dates and deadlines in this matter are ordered VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (dro) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Settlement
Thu 06/08 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement , Joint filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC.(Berry, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Vacating Scheduling Conference and Taking Matter Off Calendar Following Joint Notice of Settlement | ||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Continue
Wed 06/07 1:41 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 12, 2017 to July 26, 2017 filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC.(Berry, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Continuing Scheduling Conference | ||
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 05/02 4:49 PM
ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford, Continuing Scheduling Conference re Stipulation12 . The initial Scheduling Conference previously scheduled for May 22, 2017, is hereby continued until June 12, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. (mba) |
|
12 | 12
stip
Continue
Tue 05/02 1:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from May 22, 2017 to 30 days after the Court issues an order on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or as soon thereafter as the Court deems suitable, and that suspends the operation of Local Rule 23-3 in order to permit the Court to set a schedule for any class certification motion at the intial Scheduling Conference, if necessary Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only9 filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC.(Berry, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Continuing Scheduling Conference | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/29 2:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 , Notice (Other)10 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice (Other)4 , Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Related Case(s)3 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only9 , Corporate Disclosure Statement5 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on March 29, 2017. (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 03/28 11:42 AM
NOTICE filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. Notice of Interested Parties (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/28 8:36 AM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2017 at 9:00 am. (lb) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Mon 03/27 6:25 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Notice of Interested Parties filed under Notice (Other). It should have been filed and entered under the Notice of Interested Parties event. (esa) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 6:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/27 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 03/24 6:49 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC identifying HS Solutions Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 03/24 6:44 PM
NOTICE Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/24 6:41 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-02366-MCE (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 6:39 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Bowman, Lisa) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/24 6:35 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 30-2017 00899049 Receipt No: 0973-19575426 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (Attorney Lisa Mireille Bowman added to party Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC(pty:dft))(Bowman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Kevin Murphy | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 5:36 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC, Does 1-50, inclusive, Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, LLC, Jury Demand, filed by Plaintiff Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC. (esa) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Mon 03/27 5:37 PM
COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions, LLC.(esa) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 5:39 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Miguel Quevedo, upon Defendant Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, LLC served on 2/21/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tamara Asbury, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) |