Core Optical Technologies, LLC v. Infinera Corp.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Andrew J Guilford |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00548 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:29 AM PDT |
Defendant
Infinera Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Core Optical Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
134 | 134
attyseal
Sealed Document
Tue 09/17 12:33 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT (Confidential Exhibit 1) re Miscellaneous Document,128 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal,,132 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC.(El-Gamal, Yasser) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
133 | 133
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/13 4:38 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION BUT RETAINING JURISDICTION OVER THE ACTION AND THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR PURPOSES OF SUMMARY ENFORCEMENT by Judge Andrew J. Guilford128 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. All counterclaims asserted by defendant and counterclaimant Infinera Corp. ("Infinera") in the above-captioned action are dismissed with prejudice, with each side bearing its own fees and costs; SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
132 | 132
order
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Fri 09/13 2:01 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANT CORE OPTICAL TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL EXHIBIT 1 ATTACHED TO THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATED DISMISSAL CONDITIONED ON THE COURT RETAINING JURISDICTION OVER THE ACTION AND THE PARTIES' SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR PURPOSES OF SUMMARY ENFORCEMENT UNDER SEAL126 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. That Core Optical is granted leave to file Confidential Exhibit 1 attached to the parties' Joint Stipulated Dismissal Conditioned on the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Over the Action and the Parties' Settlement Agreement for Purposes of Summary Enforcement under seal. (yl) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
131 | 131
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Thu 09/12 6:48 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document (Confidential Exhibit 1 attached to the parties' Joint Stipulated Dismissal Conditioned on the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Over the Action and the Parties' Settlement Agreement for Purposes of Summar 126 filed by Counter Claimant Infinera Corp., Defendant Infinera Corp..(Zado, Ray) |
|
130 | 130
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Thu 09/12 2:22 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the filed date has been updated to reflect 9/11/2019 instead of 9/5/2019129 . (yl) |
|
Wednesday, September 11, 2019 | ||
129 | 129
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 09/12 1:39 PM
(REFER TO NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR)**CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT** ORDER RE: PORTIONS OF THE MAY 9, 2018 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER by Judge Andrew J. Guilford. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: That the portions of the Court's May 9, 2018 Claim Construction Order directed to the disputed terms "cross polarization interference canceller ('XPIC')" and "diagonalizer cross polarization interference cancellation network" are NOT vacated. (See order for further details) (yl) Modified on 9/12/2019 (yl) |
|
128 | 128
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Wed 09/11 7:26 PM
Joint Stipulated Dismissal Conditioned on the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Over the Action and the Parties' Settlement Agreement for Purposes of Summary Enforcement filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC(El-Gamal, Yasser) |
|
Att: 1 Confidential Exhibit 1 (Lodged Under Seal), | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
127 | 127
attyseal
Sealed Declaration in Support
Wed 09/11 7:12 PM
SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document (Confidential Exhibit 1 attached to the parties' Joint Stipulated Dismissal Conditioned on the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Over the Action and the Parties' Settlement Agreement for Purposes of Summar 126 filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Unredacted Document)(El-Gamal, Yasser) |
|
126 | 126
motion
Leave to File Document Under Seal
Wed 09/11 7:05 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document (Confidential Exhibit 1 attached to the parties' Joint Stipulated Dismissal Conditioned on the Court Retaining Jurisdiction Over the Action and the Parties' Settlement Agreement for Purposes of Summary Enforcement) under seal filed by Plaintiff Core Optical Technologies, LLC.(El-Gamal, Yasser) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service |