Nutrition Distribution LLC v. Apogee Peptides, LLC et al
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Barry Ted Moskowitz |
Referred: | Jan M Adler |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00584 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:12 AM PDT |
Defendant
Apogee Peptides, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Does 1 Through 10
|
|
Plaintiff
Nutrition Distribution LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Closing
Wed 07/05 2:42 PM
REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing Regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Attached Complaint .(cc: USPTO)(jrd) |
|
4 | 4
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 06/05 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nutrition Distribution LLC (Tauler, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 9:25 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dsn) (jao) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark FORM
Fri 03/24 9:19 AM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *See Attached Complaint* cc:USPTO (Attachment(s) #1 Complaint). (dsn) (jao) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 9:18 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Apogee Peptides, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9927189.), filed by Nutrition Distribution LLC. The new case number is 3:17-cv-584-BTM-JMA. Judge Barry Ted Moskowitz and Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler are assigned to the case. (Tauler, Robert)(dsn)(jao) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |