Hensley v. PWGA Pension & Health Plan
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | Nita L Stormes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00585 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1441eb Removal - E.R.I.S.A. Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Mar 23, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 19, 2017 2:24 AM PDT |
Defendant
PWGA Pension & Health Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Hensley
1451 Pegaso St.
Encinitas, CA 92024 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 04/12 9:38 AM
ORDER granting6 Stipulation of Dismissal. The Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice is granted pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/11/2017. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Mon 04/10 2:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by PWGA Pension & Health Plan.(Lawrence, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 04/04 11:47 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/4/2017 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/4/2017.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(acc) Modified on 4/4/2017 to correct date (acc) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/30 2:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PWGA Pension & Health Plan re3 Answer to Complaint,2 Certificate of Service (Lawrence, Aaron) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/30 2:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER by PWGA Pension & Health Plan.(Lawrence, Aaron)Attorney Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence added to party PWGA Pension & Health Plan (pty:dft) |
|
2 | 2
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 03/30 2:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PWGA Pension & Health Plan OF THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION(Lawrence, Aaron) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 03/24 10:01 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2017 00343414-SC-SC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9927359.), filed by PWGA Pension & Health Plan. The new case number is 3:17-cv-585-AJB-NLS. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(dsn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Small Claims Court Claim and Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Small Claims Subpoena |