Crane v. Price (Hawkins)
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Gonzalo P Curiel |
Referred: | Nita L Stormes |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00589 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 42:1320d-2 Health Insurance Portability And Accountability Act (HIPAA) |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Halya Price (Hawkins)
656 Hatfield Drive
San Marcos, CA 92078 |
|
Plaintiff
Gina J. Crane
1321 Ynez Place
Coronado, CA 92118 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 05/03 3:53 PM
ORDER Granting Joint5 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/17. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/28 11:16 AM
Joint Motion to Dismiss by Gina J. Crane. (fth) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
Tue 04/11 8:10 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/15/2017 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 4/10/17.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 04/06 1:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Halya Price (Hawkins).(dlg) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 03/24 1:03 PM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (dsn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/24 1:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Halya Price (Hawkins) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS089755.), filed by Gina J. Crane. The new case number is 3:17-cv-589-GPC-NLS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(dsn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |