Committee of Unsecured Creditors. v. Belkorp Industries Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30236
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30236
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Bauknight |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03005 |
Nature of Suit | 1 null 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Belkorp Industries Inc.
Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, P.C. P.O. Box 1990
Knoxville, TN 37901 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/31 2:33 PM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3005 Closed (mdt) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 10/31 2:32 PM
Disposition of Adversary 3:17-ap-3005 (mdt) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Thu 10/05 1:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/04/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
Returned Mail/E-Mail
Tue 10/03 3:10 PM
Returned Mail (nah) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Mon 10/02 3:29 PM
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. (nah) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 05/26 1:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pure Foods, Inc. 5/26/2017 (Guinn, Maurice) |
|
9 | 9
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/26 10:21 AM
Summons Issued on Pure Foods, Inc. Date Issued 5/26/2017, Answer Due 6/26/2017 (nah) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Request
Thu 05/25 4:50 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On 3rd Pty Defendant Pure Foods, Inc. (Guinn, Maurice) |
|
Att: 1 Answer and Third-Party Complaint | ||
7 | 7
answer|cmp
Answer to Complaint|Third-Party Complaint
Thu 05/25 3:48 PM
Answer to Complaint , Third-Party Complaint by Belkorp Industries Inc. against Pure Foods, Inc. . Filed by Maurice K. Guinn on behalf of Defendant Belkorp Industries Inc., 3rd Pty Defendant Pure Foods, Inc..(Guinn, Maurice) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Document
Fri 04/07 6:09 PM
Waiver of the Service of Summons Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc.. (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/27 3:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint(3:17-ap-03005-SHB) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16449052. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 3:09 PM
Summons Issued on Belkorp Industries Inc. Date Issued 3/27/2017, Answer Due 4/26/2017 (vmg) |
|
3 | 3
court
Document
Mon 03/27 12:32 PM
Civil Case Coversheet Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff Committee of Unsecured Creditors.. (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Saturday, March 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Sat 03/25 7:11 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Plaintiff Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/25 7:09 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03005. Complaint by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. against Belkorp Industries Inc.. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(01 (Determination of removed claim or cause))(Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 |