The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of P v. CoBank, ACB
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30236
Lead BK case is: 3:17-bk-30236
Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Suzanne H Bauknight |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03006 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property |
Case Filed: | Mar 25, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2017 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CoBank, ACB
Husch Blackwell LLP 190 Carondelet Plaza Suite 600
St. Louis, MO 63105 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/28/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 10/31 2:29 PM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3006 Closed (mdt) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Tue 10/31 2:29 PM
Disposition of Adversary 3:17-ap-3006 (mdt) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Sat 09/30 1:12 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/29/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
court
Returned Mail/E-Mail
Thu 09/28 3:59 PM
Returned Mail from The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (cfy) |
|
19 | 19
court
Returned Mail/E-Mail
Thu 09/28 3:25 PM
Returned Mail (mdt) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Wed 09/27 11:16 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. (mdt) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Reply
Wed 06/21 6:16 PM
Reply to CoBank, ACBs Reply to the Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors Opposition to CoBank, ACBs Motion to Dismiss Filed by Matthew Gartner on behalf of Defendant CoBank, ACB (Gartner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Wed 06/14 8:44 PM
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc. . (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Supplemental Document
Wed 05/24 2:49 PM
Supplemental Document Proposed Order Filed by Matthew Gartner on behalf of Defendant CoBank, ACB. (Gartner, Matthew) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Brief/Memorandum
Wed 05/24 1:36 PM
Brief/Memorandum Filed by Matthew Gartner on behalf of Defendant CoBank, ACB . (Gartner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 05/24 1:35 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Matthew Gartner on behalf of Defendant CoBank, ACB Objections due by 06/14/2017. (Gartner, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Notice - Auto Docket
Fri 04/28 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
11 | 11
court
Returned Mail/E-Mail
Thu 04/27 3:22 PM
Returned Mail (mdt) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Acting on Motion to Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 04/25 3:08 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time for Defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading. The Defendants deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is hereby extended to and including May 26, 2017. (mdt) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extend or Shorten Time
Tue 04/25 11:18 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time To File an Answer or Other Responsive Pleading Filed by Matthew Gartner on behalf of Defendant CoBank, ACB (Gartner, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/10 11:47 AM
Certificate of Service [Amended Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint] Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc. . (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Amended Document
Fri 04/07 6:10 PM
Amended Document [Amended Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint] Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc.. (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/03 3:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc. . (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card
Mon 03/27 3:22 PM
Receipt of Complaint(3:17-ap-03006-SHB) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 16449052. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Mon 03/27 2:02 PM
Summons Issued on CoBank, ACB Date Issued 3/27/2017, Answer Due 4/26/2017 (mdt) |
|
3 | 3
court
Document
Mon 03/27 12:33 PM
Civil Case Coversheet Filed by Ronald A. Clifford on behalf of Plaintiff The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Pure Foods, Inc.. (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Saturday, March 25, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Summons Request
Sat 03/25 8:14 PM
Request Summons Be Issued On Plaintiff Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Clifford, Ronald) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 03/25 8:13 PM
Adversary case 3:17-ap-03006. Complaint by Committee of Unsecured Creditors against CoBank, ACB. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property))(Clifford, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 |