Maryland District Court
Judge:J Frederick Motz
Case #: 1:17-cv-00831
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2017
Terminated:Sep 06, 2017
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Delmarva Power & Light Company
Represented By
Jeffrey M Yeatman
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
James D Mathias
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Plaintiff
Tyisha Chambers
Denton, MD 21629
Represented By
Guy L Watts, II
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Kirk G Simpkins
Simpkins And Simpkins PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Bonnie Edwards
Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Rodney Todd, Deceased 1908 Chruch Creek
Church Creek, MD 21622
Represented By
Guy L Watts, II
Watts Guerra LLP
contact info
Kirk G Simpkins
Simpkins And Simpkins PA
contact info

GPO Sep 06 2017
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/6/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/06 1:24 PM
ORDER granting8 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/6/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Wed 09/06 1:22 PM
MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge J. Frederick Motz on 9/6/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
18 18 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/14 9:26 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company.(Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 08/14 9:20 AM
(FILED IN ERROR - Refiled as ECF 18) REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company.(Yeatman, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/14/2017 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 08/14 8:01 AM
QC NOTICE:15 Response in Support of Motion filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies -> Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
15 15 respm Response in Support of Motion Fri 08/11 4:31 PM
RESPONSE in Support re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company.(Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
14 14 respm Response to Motion Fri 07/28 5:13 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Tyisha Chambers, Bonnie Edwards.(Watts, Guy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
13 13 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/25 10:17 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Guy L Watts. Directing attorney Guy L Watts to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/25/2017. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2017
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/19 12:42 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Guy L Watts II (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-6785729.) by Tyisha Chambers, Bonnie Edwards(Simpkins, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
11 11 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Mon 07/17 10:16 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Delmarva Power & Light Company identifying Corporate Parent Exelon Corporation, Corporate Parent Pepco Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate PH Holdco LLC, Other Affiliate Exelon Energy Delivery Company, LLC for Delmarva Power & Light Company.(Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 07/17 8:47 AM
QC NOTICE:9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2017
9 9 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Fri 07/14 5:21 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Delmarva Power & Light Company (Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 07/14 5:17 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Delmarva Power & Light Company(Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4,
Att: 7 Exhibit 5,
Att: 8 Exhibit 6,
Att: 9 Exhibit 7,
Att: 10 Exhibit 8,
Att: 11 Exhibit 9,
Att: 12 Exhibit 10,
Att: 13 Exhibit 11,
Att: 14 Exhibit 12,
Att: 15 Exhibit 13,
Att: 16 Exhibit 14
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/20 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James D Mathias on behalf of Delmarva Power & Light Company (Mathias, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 06/20 1:15 PM
QC NOTICE: as to the5 Notice of Appearance filed by Delmarva Power & Light Company. **Each attorney must file their Notice of Appearance using their CM/ECF login in order to be added as counsel to a case. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/20 10:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Yeatman on behalf of Delmarva Power & Light Company (Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
4 4 misc Stipulation Mon 06/19 4:42 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by the Parties by Delmarva Power & Light Company(Yeatman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 03/28 2:33 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Delmarva Power & Light Company.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 03/28 12:11 PM
(FILED IN ERROR) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tyisha Chambers as to Delmarva Power & Light Company.(Simpkins, Kirk) Modified on 3/28/2017 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/28 8:15 AM
Case Assigned to Judge J. Frederick Motz. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/27 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Delmarva Power & Light Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6575039.), filed by Tyisha Chambers, Bonnie Edwards.(Simpkins, Kirk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet