Santander Bank, N.A. v. Cashman Equipment Corp et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Denise J Casper |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10527 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 6:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
James M Cashman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cashman Equipment Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Servicio Marina Superior, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
Rockland Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Santander Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 09/18 10:50 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Case is dismissed without prejudice to either party moving to restore it to the docket, upon final determination of bankruptcy proceedings, by filing an appropriate motion.(Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
44 | 44
2
pgs
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Mon 06/12 4:12 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Cashman Equipment Corp., Servicio Marina Superior, LLC and Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC by Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC. (Bennett, Charles) |
|
43 | 43
2
pgs
misc
Suggestion of Bankruptcy
Mon 06/12 3:33 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to James M. Cashman with certificate of service by James M Cashman. (Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
21
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 4:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses with Certificate of Service by James M Cashman.(Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
41 | 41
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/07 4:35 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC.(Bennett, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
40 | 40
4
pgs
misc
Status Report
Tue 06/06 4:56 PM
STATUS REPORT by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Humeniuk, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 05/31 2:58 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, James M Cashman answer due 6/7/2017; Cashman Equipment Corp. answer due 6/7/2017; Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC answer due 6/7/2017; Servicio Marina Superior, LLC answer due 6/7/2017. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 05/30 5:40 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to June 7, 2017 to File Answer re1 Complaint, with certificate of service by James M Cashman, Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC.(Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order
Fri 05/19 4:14 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER Adjourning Hearing on Motion for Issuance of a Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
36 | 36
minutes
Motion Hearing Order on Motion for Writ
Fri 05/19 4:04 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 5/19/2017 re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Santander Bank, N.A. Arguments. Court to hold off ruling on the motion until 6/17/17. See Order adjourning hearing dated 5/19/17. Court takes under advisement3 Motion for Writ. (Court Reporter: Debra Joyce at joycedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Scott Magee and Jonathan Young for the plaintiff. Charles Bennett, Jeffrey Sternklar, Michael Connolly and Ethan Jeffrey for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
35 | 35
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/19 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Connolly on behalf of Rockland Trust Company (Connolly, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
13
pgs
respm
Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/18 5:06 PM
Opposition re27 MOTION to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiff's Attachment Motion filed by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Magee, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 05/16 9:49 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Evan J. Zucker. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 05/16 9:48 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michael B. Schaedle. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/15 2:00 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Evan J. Zucker Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6626766 by Rockland Trust Company.(Cohn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/15 1:57 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michael B. Schaedle Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6626725 by Rockland Trust Company.(Cohn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Certification | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Fri 05/05 9:40 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment : Motion Hearing set for 5/19/2017 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
28 | 28
minutes
Motion Hearing
Fri 05/05 9:40 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Denise J. Casper: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2017 re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Santander Bank, N.A. Counsel ask for a brief postponement of the hearing to try to work matter out. Counsel request adjournment until 5/19/17. Counsel agree to the status until the 5/19/17 hearing. (Court Reporter: Debra Lajoie at lajoiedebra@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Scott Magee and Jonathan Young for the plaintiff. Daniel Cohn, Charles Bennett and Jeffrey Sternklar for the defendants.) (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
3
pgs
motion
Intervene
Thu 05/04 1:46 PM
MOTION to Intervene and Opposition to Plaintiff's Attachment Motion by Rockland Trust Company.(Cohn, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 15 pgs Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene, | ||
Att: 2 18 pgs Declaration in Support of Motion to Intervene | ||
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
10
pgs
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 04/28 3:02 PM
REPLY to Response to3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Magee, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Tue 04/25 11:15 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting24 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Stephen J. Humeniuk. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Maynard, Timothy) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/21 2:19 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Stephen J. Humeniuk Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6592420 by Santander Bank, N.A..(Magee, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
23 | 23
3
pgs
misc
Declaration
Fri 04/21 1:44 PM
DECLARATION re22 Opposition to Motion by James M Cashman.(Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A Mortgage | ||
22 | 22
13
pgs
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 1:42 PM
Opposition re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment with certificate of service filed by James M Cashman. (Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
21 | 21
9
pgs
respm
Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 1:07 PM
Opposition re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC. (Bennett, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, April 18, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/18 9:17 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint, James M Cashman answer due 5/30/2017. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/18 9:15 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment Responses due by 4/21/2017 Replies due by 4/28/2017. The 5/4/17 hearing remains in place. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Saturday, April 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Sat 04/15 9:40 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with certificate of service by James M Cashman.(Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Sat 04/15 9:38 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 21, 2017 to File Response/Reply as to4 Memorandum in Support of Motion,3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment with certificate of service by James M Cashman.(Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice Setting or Resetting Hearing on Motion
Fri 04/14 10:07 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment : Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 02:15 PM in Courtroom 11 before Judge Denise J. Casper. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Fri 04/14 10:06 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to April 18, 2017 to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion For Attachment and for Leave to File Reply Brief by Santander Bank, N.A. (Hourihan, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 04/13 1:57 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 18, 2017 to File Defendants' Opposition to Motion For Attachment and for Leave to File Reply Brief by Santander Bank, N.A..(Magee, Scott) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 04/06 1:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D. Sternklar on behalf of James M Cashman (Sternklar, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service pursuant to LR 5.2
Tue 04/04 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE pursuant to LR 5.2 by Santander Bank, N.A. re4 Memorandum in Support of Motion,5 Affidavit in Support of Motion,3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment ,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Amended) . (Magee, Scott) |
|
11 | 11
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/04 10:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Santander Bank, N.A.. Cashman Equipment Corp. waiver sent on 3/30/2017, answer due 5/30/2017; Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (Magee, Scott) |
|
10 | 10
1
pgs
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 04/04 10:47 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Santander Bank, N.A.. Servicio Marina Superior, LLC waiver sent on 3/30/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. (Magee, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 04/04 10:44 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Santander Bank, N.A.. James M Cashman served on 3/30/2017, answer due 4/20/2017. Acknowledgement filed by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Magee, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 03/29 3:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles R. Bennett, Jr on behalf of Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC (Bennett, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 11:44 AM
Summons Issued as to James M Cashman, Cashman Equipment Corp., Mystic Adventure Sails, LLC, Servicio Marina Superior, LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Case Assignment
Tue 03/28 11:39 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge M. Page Kelley. (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 03/27 6:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Bret E. Bokelkamp in Support re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Santander Bank, N.A..(Magee, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
4 | 4
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 03/27 6:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re3 MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment filed by Santander Bank, N.A.. (Magee, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Writ
Mon 03/27 6:34 PM
MOTION for Writ of Attachment and Writ of Trustee Process Attachment by Santander Bank, N.A..(Magee, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/27 6:09 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Santander Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Santander Holdings, USA, Inc., Other Affiliate Banco Santander, S.A. for Santander Bank, N.A... (Magee, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
24
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/27 5:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Santander Bank, N.A. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6554171 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Santander Bank, N.A..(Magee, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Local Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E (part 1), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E (part 2), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit J |