Holzworth v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. et al
Massachusetts District Court | |
Judge: | Donald L Cabell |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-10529 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
Dale Holzworth, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/26 7:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dale Holzworth, Sr (Mclawhorn, Todd) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Wed 04/12 3:59 PM
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 and7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Ke Liu and Todd L. Mclawhorn for Dale Holzworth, Sr. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Russo, Noreen) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 4:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Todd L. Mclawhorn Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6574538 by Dale Holzworth, Sr.(Shapoval, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
6 | 6
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 04/07 4:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Ke Liu Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6574425 by Dale Holzworth, Sr.(Shapoval, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear
Thu 04/06 1:40 PM
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Joseph H. Siprut, Esq. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Russo, Noreen) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 04/06 11:57 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Joseph J. Siprut Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-6570896 by Dale Holzworth, Sr.(Shapoval, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit and Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 03/28 2:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge
Tue 03/28 1:18 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Coppola, Katelyn) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/27 6:15 PM
COMPLAINT against Dale Holzworth, Sr Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6554184 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Dale Holzworth, Sr.(Shapoval, Alexander) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Category Sheet |