Holden et al v. The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | John G Koeltl |
Referred: | Robert W Lehrburger |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02192 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 5:51 AM EDT |
Defendant
John Doe Officers 1-4
|
|
Defendant
Shaun Kehoe
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Opromalla
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Port Authority Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Tone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cornell Holden
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Mejia
|
Represented By
|
1. | Port Authority Bathroom Arrests Spur Lawsuit (wsj.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/28/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |