Armored Republic LLC v. Under Armour Incorporated
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Diane J Humetewa |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00892 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 25, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2017 2:53 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
Under Armour Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Armored Republic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Under Armour Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Armored Republic LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Monday, February 25, 2019 | ||
72 | 72
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/25 5:50 PM
ORDER approving the70 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, without prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Telephonic Status Conference scheduled for 2/26/2019 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/25/2019. (LFIG) |
|
71 | 71
motion
Vacate
Mon 02/25 5:45 PM
Joint MOTION to Vacate70 Stipulation of Dismissal, 69 Order Telephonic Status Conference by Armored Republic LLC.(Long, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
70 | 70
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/25 4:52 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by Armored Republic LLC.(Long, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
69 | 69
order
Order
Fri 02/22 8:26 AM
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED the Status Conference set for 2/26/2019 is RESET as a Telephonic Status Conference for 2/26/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Participating counsel will receive teleconference instructions by a separate electronic mail notice. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/22/2019. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) |