Tolson v. City of Scottsdale Police Department et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Roslyn O Silver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00907 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 23, 2017 3:41 AM MST |
Defendant
City of Scottsdale Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
T Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Jones
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unknown Parties
|
|
Plaintiff
Byron Dean Tolson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 07/21 8:46 AM
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's motion to dismiss with prejudice (Doc.9 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED each party will bear its own attorney's fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim5 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court will close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/20/17. (LAD) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 06/05 10:29 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by City of Scottsdale Police Department, T Jones. (Davis, Lori) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 06/02 12:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Byron Dean Tolson.(Finch, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/04 4:02 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to the Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED the motion (Doc.7 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have through and including June 5, 2017, to file his Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/4/2017. (KAL) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 05/03 2:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Byron Dean Tolson. (Finch, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 04/05 1:51 PM
NOTICE re: Supplemental Notice of Certificate of Conferral by City of Scottsdale Police Department, T Jones, Unknown Jones re:4 Notice (Other) . (Davis, Lori) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 04/03 5:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Scottsdale Police Department, T Jones, Unknown Jones.(Davis, Lori) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-3 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 04/03 5:05 PM
NOTICE re: Conferral by City of Scottsdale Police Department, T Jones, Unknown Jones . (Davis, Lori) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order re Rule 12(b) Motions
Tue 03/28 4:30 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and file notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/28/2017. (KAL) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
New Case Opened
Mon 03/27 4:37 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-14057937. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Roslyn O Silver. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 17-00907 PHX-ROS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KGM) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 03/27 4:23 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2016-054920. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14057937 filed by City of Scottsdale Police Department, Unknown Jones, T Jones (submitted by Lori Davis).(KGM) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Service Executed
Mon 03/27 4:30 PM
*****State Court records received on 3/27/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Byron Dean Tolson: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon City of Scottsdale Police Department on 2/24/17.*****Filed in State Court on 2/28/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/27/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |
||
service
Service Executed
Mon 03/27 4:33 PM
*****State Court record received on 3/27/17*****SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Byron Dean Tolson: Affidavit of Process re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Officer Tony Jones on 2/27/17.*****Filed in State Court on 3/2/17, docketed in US District Court on 3/27/17 for case management purposes.***** (KGM) |