JANKOSA INC.
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | August B Landis |
Case #: | 2:17-bk-11492 |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | May 04, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Sep 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
JANKROSA INC.
1600 N Jones Blvd
Las Vegas, NV 89108-1606 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 11
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD S. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
59 | 59
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11 and Split/Transfer/Dismissed only)
Thu 10/12 11:03 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (lms) |